EP3875281 - PLANOGRAPHIC PRINTING PLATE PRECURSOR, METHOD OF PREPARING A PLANOGRAPHIC PRINTING PLATE AND PLANOGRAPHIC PRINTING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/36] | LITHOGRAPHIC PRINTING PLATE ORIGINAL PLATE, METHOD FOR PRODUCING LITHOGRAPHIC PRINTING PLATE AND LITHOGRAPHIC PRINTING METHOD | ||
[2024/15] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | [2021/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOGOSHI, Keisuke c/o FUJIFILM Corporation, 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun, Shizuoka 421-0396 / JP | 02 /
SAKAGUCHI, Akira c/o FUJIFILM Corporation, 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun, Shizuoka 421-0396 / JP | [2021/36] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/36] | Application number, filing date | 19877722.9 | 31.10.2019 | [2021/36] | WO2019JP42871 | Priority number, date | JP20180205751 | 31.10.2018 Original published format: JP 2018205751 | JP20190122430 | 28.06.2019 Original published format: JP 2019122430 | [2021/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020090995 | Date: | 07.05.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3875281 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3875281 | Date: | 04.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B41C1/10 | [2021/51] | CPC: |
B41C1/1008 (EP);
B41C2210/04 (EP);
B41C2210/08 (EP);
B41C2210/22 (EP);
B41C2210/24 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/36] | B41N1/14, G03F7/00, G03F7/004, G03F7/027, G03F7/029, G03F7/033, G03F7/11 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PLANOGRAPHISCHER DRUCKPLATTENVORLÄUFER, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER PLANOGRAPHISCHEN DRUCKPLATTE UND PLANOGRAPHISCHES DRUCKVERFAHREN | [2024/15] | English: | PLANOGRAPHIC PRINTING PLATE PRECURSOR, METHOD OF PREPARING A PLANOGRAPHIC PRINTING PLATE AND PLANOGRAPHIC PRINTING METHOD | [2024/15] | French: | PRÉCURSEUR DE PLAQUE D'IMPRESSION PLANOGRAPHIQUE, PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE PLAQUE D'IMPRESSION PLANOGRAPHIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ D'IMPRESSION PLANOGRAPHIQUE | [2024/15] |
Former [2021/36] | LITHOGRAPHISCHE DRUCKPLATTENORIGINALPLATTE, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER LITHOGRAPHISCHEN DRUCKPLATTE UND LITHOGRAPHISCHES DRUCKVERFAHREN | ||
Former [2021/36] | LITHOGRAPHIC PRINTING PLATE ORIGINAL PLATE, METHOD FOR PRODUCING LITHOGRAPHIC PRINTING PLATE AND LITHOGRAPHIC PRINTING METHOD | ||
Former [2021/36] | PLAQUE ORIGINALE DE PLAQUE D'IMPRESSION LITHOGRAPHIQUE, PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE PLAQUE D'IMPRESSION LITHOGRAPHIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ D'IMPRESSION LITHOGRAPHIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2021 | Translation filed | 28.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 28.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/36] | 08.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2009269699 (MUNNELLY HEIDI M [US], et al) [X] 1-11, 14-22, 26- 27 * claims 1-20, paragraphs [0076], [0085], [0142]-[0166] * [Y] 12-13, 21-25; | [XY]WO2017141882 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [X] 1-11, 14-20, 22- 24, 26-27 * claims 1-15, paragraphs [0034]-[0036], [0110]-[0117], [0152], [0174], [0224], [0280]-[0285], [0291], [0312]-[0313], [0329]-[0333], [0343]-[0354] * [Y] 12-13, 21-25; | [XY]WO2018043259 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [X] 1-11, 14-20, 23-24, 26-27 * claims 1-12, paragraphs [0026], [0071]-[0079], [0116], [0168], [0196][0201], [0226]-[0227], [0243]-[0246], [0250][0262] * [Y] 12-13, 21-22, 25; | [XY]WO2018043150 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [X] 1-11, 14-20, 23- 24, 26-27 * claims 1-13, paragraphs [0039], [0066]-[0090], [0118], [0177], [0201][0206], [0222]-[0223], [0242]-[0247], [0251][0256] * [Y] 12-13, 21-22, 25; | [Y]WO2018092661 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [Y] 16-20 * paragraphs [0267]-[0304] *; | [XY]WO2018159710 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [X] 1-15, 22-24, 26- 27 * claims 1-15, paragraphs [0016], [0034]-[0036], [0037], [0047], [0075], [0081], [0092]-[0110] * [Y] 12-13, 16- 21, 23, 25; | [Y]JP2018140618 (FUJIFILM CORP) [Y] 24-25* claim 1, paragraphs [0146]-[0202] * | Examination | EP3647069 | by applicant | US2714066 | US3181461 | US3276868 | US3280734 | US3458311 | JPS4841708B | US3902734 | JPS5137193 | US4153461 | JPS5549729B | JPS5617654B | JPS5849860B | JPS61166544 | JPS6239417B | JPS6239418B | US4689272 | JPH0216765B | JPH0232293B | JPH02304441 | JPH055005 | JPH0545885 | JPH0635174 | JPH08108621 | JPH08505958 | JPH09179296 | JPH09179297 | JPH09179298 | JPH10282679 | JPH10333321 | JP2000250211 | JP2001133969 | JP2001222101 | JP2001253181 | JP2001322365 | JP2001342222 | JP2002023360 | JP2002040638 | JP2002162741 | JP2002275129 | JP2002278057 | JP2002287344 | JP2002328465 | JP2003064130 | JP2003280187 | JP2003344997 | JP2004294935 | JP2005125749 | JP2005238816 | JP2005250216 | JP2006508380 | JP2006065210 | JP2006188038 | JP2006215263 | JP2006243493 | JP2006239867 | JP2006259137 | JP2006297907 | US7153632 | JP2007050660 | JP2007090850 | JP2007094138 | JP2007293221 | JP2007293223 | JP2008503365 | JP2008195018 | JP2008256850 | JP2008284858 | JP2008284817 | JP2008544322 | JP2009090645 | JP2009208458 | JP2012148555 | JP2012206495 | JP2014104631 | WO2016027886 | JP2018205751 | JP2019122430 |