EP3874502 - VECTORIZED PROCESSING LEVEL CALIBRATION IN A MEMORY COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.06.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micron Technology, Inc. 8000 South Federal Way P.O. Box 6 Boise, ID 83707-0006 / US | [2021/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHEPEREK, Michael c/o Micron Technology, Inc. 8000 S. Federal Way P.O. Box 6 Boise, ID 83707-0006 / US | 02 /
KOUDELE, Larry, J. c/o Micron Technology, Inc. 8000 S. Federal Way P.O. Box 6 Boise, ID 83707-0006 / US | [2021/36] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2021/36] | Application number, filing date | 19877870.6 | 24.10.2019 | [2021/36] | WO2019US57831 | Priority number, date | US201816176173 | 31.10.2018 Original published format: US201816176173 | [2021/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020092119 | Date: | 07.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3874502 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G11C29/02, G11C29/16, G11C29/52, // G11C11/56 | [2022/31] | CPC: |
G11C29/021 (EP);
G11C5/147 (KR);
G06F3/0629 (US);
G06F11/1048 (KR);
G06F12/0253 (KR);
G06F3/0619 (US);
G06F3/0655 (US);
G06F3/0658 (KR);
G06F3/0679 (US);
G11C29/028 (EP);
G11C29/16 (EP);
G11C29/52 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/36] | G11C5/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/36] | Title | German: | KALIBRIERUNG VEKTORISIERTER VERARBEITUNGSEBENEN IN EINER SPEICHERKOMPONENTE | [2021/36] | English: | VECTORIZED PROCESSING LEVEL CALIBRATION IN A MEMORY COMPONENT | [2021/36] | French: | ÉTALONNAGE DE NIVEAU DE TRAITEMENT VECTORISÉ DANS UN COMPOSANT DE MÉMOIRE | [2021/36] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 25.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/36] | 21.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/29] | 27.02.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010296350 (KIM YONG JUNE [KR], et al) [A] 3,10 * figure 4 *; | [A]US2014258796 (GHALY MAI A [US], et al) [A] 3,10 * figure 2 *; | [XA]US2014347923 (GHALY MAI A [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-10,13-15 * paragraphs [0020] - [0027] - [0041] - [0042]; figures 1,4 * [A] 4,5,11,12; | [A]US2017235633 (PARK HYUNKOOK [KR]) [A] 1-15* figure 10 * | International search | [A]US6850430 (PERNER FREDERICK A [US]) [A] 1-20 * See column 3, line 30 - column 4, line 57; and figures 3-5. *; | [A]US2010296350 (KIM YONG JUNE [KR], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraph [0040]; and figures 2-3. *; | [A]KR20140050145 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0026]-[0143]; and figures 1-10. *; | [A]US2014365836 (JEON SEUNGJUNE [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0084]-[0100]; and figures 4-9B. *; | [A]US9576671 (KARAKULAK SEYHAN [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See column 6, lines 14-43; claims 1, 11; and figure 4. *; | [A]US2017235633 (PARK HYUNKOOK [KR]) [A] 1-20* See paragraphs [0072]-[0095]; and figures 7-12. * |