EP3874920 - LOW-PROFILE HOUSING FOR ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CZ, RO | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bourns, Inc. 1200 Columbia Avenue Riverside, CA 92507 / US | [2021/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHEEHAN, Cathal 1200 Columbia Avenue Riverside, California 92507 / US | 02 /
HENNESSY, Tom 1200 Columbia Avenue Riverside, California 92507 / US | [2021/36] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Laurent & Charras Le Contemporain 50 Chemin de la Bruyère 69574 Dardilly Cedex / FR | [2021/36] | Application number, filing date | 19877899.5 | 30.10.2019 | [2021/36] | WO2019US58950 | Priority number, date | US201862754413P | 01.11.2018 Original published format: US 201862754413 P | [2021/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020092636 | Date: | 07.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3874920 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3874920 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H05K5/02, H01F27/02, H01F27/24, H01F27/28, H01F27/32, H01F27/34, H05K1/18 | [2021/36] | CPC: |
H01F27/02 (EP,KR,US);
H01F27/2823 (KR,US);
H01F27/2828 (EP,KR);
H01F27/29 (EP,KR,US);
H01F27/306 (EP,KR);
H01F2027/065 (EP,KR);
H01F2027/297 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEHÄUSE MIT NIEDRIGEM PROFIL FÜR ELEKTRONISCHE KOMPONENTEN | [2021/36] | English: | LOW-PROFILE HOUSING FOR ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS | [2021/36] | French: | BOÎTIER À FAIBLE ENCOMBREMENT POUR COMPOSANTS ÉLECTRONIQUES | [2021/36] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 28.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/36] | 09.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 20.12.2023 | HR | 20.12.2023 | RO | 20.12.2023 | RS | 20.12.2023 | SM | 20.12.2023 | NO | 20.03.2024 | GR | 21.03.2024 | IS | 20.04.2024 | [2024/35] |
Former [2024/33] | HR | 20.12.2023 | |
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | HR | 20.12.2023 | |
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | HR | 20.12.2023 | |
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 21.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]US6753749 (CHIN KWONG KEI [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6,8,9 * column 1, lines 5 - 18 * * column 2, lines 42 - 53 * * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 17 * * column 5, lines 27 -55 * * figures 1 -5, 11 * [A] 4,12 [Y] 7,10,11,13-15 [I] 13,14; | [Y]EP1653487 (PATENT TREUHAND GES FUER ELEKTRISCHE GLUEHLAMPEN MBH [DE], et al) [Y] 13,14 * paragraphs [0001] , [ 0002] , [ 0005 ] - [ 0007] - [ 0019] , [ 0024] , [ 0025] , [ 0030] * * paragraphs [0034] , [ 0064] ** figures 4, 10 *; | [Y]US2012119864 (LINT JAMES DOUGLAS [US]) [Y] 7,10,11,15 * paragraphs [0001] , [ 0011] , [ 0012] , [ 0046] , [ 0047] , [ 0053] , [ 0068] * * figures 1, 2, 6 * | International search | [XY]US6753749 (CHIN KWONG KEI [US]) [X] 1-3, 5, 6, 8, 9, 16, 17, 20-24, 35-38 * entire document * [Y] 7, 18, 19, 25-27, 33, 34; | [A]US2013092411 (CHEN LIEN-HSING [TW], et al) [A] 1-38 * entire document *; | [A]US2014306785 (MAIER HERBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1-38* entire document *; | [Y]US2017338022 (LINT JAMES DOUGLAS [US]) [Y] 7, 18, 19, 25-27, 33, 34 * entire document *; | [A]GB2555873 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) [A] 1-38 * entire document * |