EP3875093 - HEART RATE DECREASING AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Furukawa Research Office Co., Ltd. 4-23-12 Seijo Setagaya-ku Tokyo 157-0066 / JP | [2021/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FURUKAWA, Satoru 4-23-12, Seijo, Setagaya-ku Tokyo 157-0066 / JP | [2021/36] | Representative(s) | Brand Murray Fuller LLP 50 Eastcastle Street London W1W 8EA / GB | [2021/36] | Application number, filing date | 19878056.1 | 31.10.2019 | [2021/36] | WO2019JP42924 | Priority number, date | JP20180207116 | 02.11.2018 Original published format: JP 2018207116 | [2021/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020091014 | Date: | 07.05.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3875093 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/513, A61P9/00, A61P9/04, A61P11/00 | [2021/36] | CPC: |
A61P9/04 (EP,US);
A61K31/513 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/36] | Title | German: | HERZFREQUENZSENKENDES MITTEL | [2021/36] | English: | HEART RATE DECREASING AGENT | [2021/36] | French: | AGENT DIMINUANT LA FRÉQUENCE CARDIAQUE | [2021/36] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2021 | Translation filed | 27.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 27.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/36] | 30.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/31] | 02.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2010190737 (BELENKY YEVSEY [US], et al) [Y] 1-3* examples 2, 4 *; | [Y] - MIRICA SILVIA N. ET AL, "Magnesium orotate elicits acute cardioprotection at reperfusion in isolated and in vivo rat hearts", CANADIAN JOURNAL OF PHYSIOLOGY AND PHARMACOLOGY, CANADA, vol. 91, no. 2, doi:10.1139/cjpp-2012-0216, ISSN 0008-4212, (20130201), pages 108 - 115, URL: http://dx.doi.org/10.1139/cjpp-2012-0216, (20220613), XP055930000 [Y] 1-3 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1139/cjpp-2012-0216 | [Y] - Franklin L Rosenfeldt ET AL, "Mechanism of Cardioprotective Effect of Orotic Acid", Cardiovascular Drugs and Therapy, Boston, doi:10.1023/A:1007700716866, (19980401), pages 159 - 170, URL: https://link.springer.com/content/pdf/10.1023/A:1007700716866.pdf, (20190305), XP055564628 [Y] 1-3 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1007700716866 | International search | [Y]JP2000516937 (WISS, Osawld) [Y] 1-5 * claims, page 11, paragraph [0002], examples 37-38 *; | [Y]JP2012246280 (KIRIN HOLDINGS CO LTD, et al) [Y] 1-5 * claims, examples *; | [X] - Martynov A I, Akatova E V, "Fifteen years experience of the use of magnesium preparations in patients with mitral valve prolapse", Kardiologiia, (20191223), vol. 51, no. 6, ISSN 0022-9040, pages 60 - 65, XP009527692 [X] 1-5 * , abstract * | [ ] - PubMed, Database accession no. 21878073 | [Y] - SATO, NOBUHIRO et al., "Acute effect of ethanol on hemoperfusion and oxidative metabolism in the liver in vivo", Kanzo, (19810000), vol. 22, no. 4, pages 546 - 551, XP055807481 [Y] 1-5 | by applicant | JPS5515481 | JPH0710235 | JP2011098896 | JP2011136907 | JP2012126683 | JP2012246280 | WO2016182053 | - Keio University's Sports Medical Research Center Bulletin, (19990000), pages 33 - 39 |