EP3875595 - LIQUID MEDIUM PREPARATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.08.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyowa Kirin Co., Ltd. 1-9-2, Otemachi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | [2021/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIRA Shusuke c/o Head Office, Kyowa Kirin Co., Ltd., 1-9-2, Otemachi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | 02 /
SUZAWA Toshiyuki c/o Head Office, Kyowa Kirin Co., Ltd., 1-9-2, Otemachi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | [2021/36] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/36] | Application number, filing date | 19878782.2 | 01.11.2019 | [2021/36] | WO2019JP43031 | Priority number, date | US201862754793P | 02.11.2018 Original published format: US 201862754793 P | [2021/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020091041 | Date: | 07.05.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3875595 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C12P21/08, C12N5/16, C12N1/00, C12N5/00, C12P21/02 | [2022/28] | CPC: |
C12N5/0018 (EP,US);
C12P21/02 (EP,US);
C12N2500/02 (EP,US);
C12N2500/10 (EP);
C12N2500/20 (US);
C12N2500/32 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2021/36] | C12P21/08, C12N5/16, C12N1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/36] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES FLÜSSIGEN MEDIUMS | [2021/36] | English: | LIQUID MEDIUM PREPARATION METHOD | [2021/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE MILIEU DE CULTURE LIQUIDE | [2021/36] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2021 | Translation filed | 30.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 30.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/36] | 21.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.10.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2016289633 (YANG WILLIAM C [US], et al) [X] 14-17 * Sparging media with oxygen/air for CHO culture.; paragraphs [0072] - [0078] - [ 0171] - paragraph [0180]; example 1 *[A] 1-13; | [XA]US2017356022 (KHAN MOHSAN WASEEM [GB], et al) [X] 14-17 * Prevention of formation of factors causing protein product dissociation.; paragraph [0173] - paragraphs [0182] , [ 0218] , [ 0231]; figure 1 * [A] 1-13; | [XA]US10017732 (VIJAYASANKARAN NATARAJAN [US], et al) [X] 14-17 * Cell line antibody production.; paragraph [0190] - paragraph [0193]; examples 2, 3 * [A] 1-13 | International search | [XYA]WO2012091023 (KYOWA HAKKO KIRIN CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-5, 7-8, 10, 14-27 * claims, paragraphs [0032], [0035] * [Y] 1-5, 7-8, 10, 14-33 [A] 6, 9, 11-13; | [YA]JP2018068279 (LEK PHARMACEUTICALS DD) [Y] 1-5, 7-8, 10, 14-2 * (2018-05-10) paragraph [0004] * [A] 6, 9, 11-13; | [A] - MAYER, R. A. et al., "Preparation of media and buffers with soluble lead", Analytical Biochemistry, (20060000), vol. 356, doi:10.1016/j.ab.2006.02.032, pages 142 - 144, XP024942068 [A] 1-33 * , entire text * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ab.2006.02.032 | by applicant | JPH02227075 | JPH0322979 | JPH05336963 | WO9423021 | WO9630046 | WO9640201 | US5725856 | US5736137 | WO9851793 | US6855544 | WO2005017130 | WO2010008075 | - D. BRUHLMANN et al., Biotechnology Progress, (20150000), vol. 31, pages 615 - 629 | - T. KASCHAK et al., mAbs, (20110000), vol. 6, pages 577 - 583 | - R. J. HAY et al., Nature, (19890000), vol. 339, pages 487 - 488 | - The Journal of the American Medical Association, (19670000), vol. 199, page 519 | - Science, (19520000), vol. 122, page 501 | - Virology, (19590000), vol. 8, page 396 | - Proceeding of the Society for the Biological Medicine, (19500000), vol. 73, page 1 | - Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19650000), vol. 53, page 288 | - J. Experimental Medicine, (19780000), vol. 147, page 923 | - Journal of Experimental Medicine, (19580000), vol. 108, page 945 | - Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19680000), vol. 60, page 1275 | - Genetics, (19680000), vol. 55, page 513 | - Chromosoma, (19730000), vol. 41, page 129 | - Methods in Cell Science, (19960000), vol. 18, page 115 | - Radiation Research, (19970000), vol. 148, page 260 | - Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19800000), vol. 77, page 4216 | - Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci., (19680000), vol. 60, page 1275 | - Cell, (19750000), vol. 6, page 121 | - Cytotechnology, (19900000), vol. 3, pages 133 - 900 | - Nature, (19870000), vol. 329, page 840 | - J. Biochem., (19870000), vol. 101, page 1307 | - Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19870000), vol. 84, page 7413 | - Virology, (19730000), vol. 52, page 456 | - J. Biol. Chem., (19770000), vol. 252, page 1998 | - Nature, (19940000), vol. 369, page 533 | - J. Biol. Chem., (19830000), vol. 258, page 9017 | - J. Exp. Med., (19920000), vol. 173, page 269 | - Science, (19760000), vol. 193, page 1007 | - J. Leuc. Biol., (19940000), vol. 55, page 280 | - Cancer Immunol. Immunother., (19930000), vol. 36, page 260 | - Cancer Res., (19940000), vol. 54, page 1511 | - Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19920000), vol. 89, page 4285 | - British J. Cancer, (20000000), vol. 83, page 493 | - Molecular Immunol., (19990000), vol. 36, page 387 | - Cancer, (20000000), vol. 88, page 2909 | - LOWE et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19890000), vol. 86, page 8227 | - J. Biol. Chem., (19900000), vol. 265, page 16455 | - J. Neurosci. Res., (19950000), vol. 40, page 647 | - J. Urology, (19980000), vol. 160, page 2396 | - Cancer Res., (19970000), vol. 57, page 4593 | - Oncogene, (20000000), vol. 19, page 2138 | - Curr. Opin. Oncol., (19980000), vol. 10, page 548 | - Cancer Res., vol. 55, no. 23, pages 5935s - 5945s | - Immunol. Rev., (19920000), vol. 127, page 5 | - Molecular Immunol., (19940000), vol. 31, page 371 | - Cytokine, (19910000), vol. 3, page 562 | - J. Immunol. Methods, (19980000), vol. 217, page 41 | - Hybridoma, (19940000), vol. 13, page 183 | - Molecular Pharmacol., (20000000), vol. 58, page 237 | - Nature, (19990000), vol. 400, page 776 | - PERI et al., J. Immunol. Meth., (19940000), vol. 174, page 249 | - J. Exp. Med., (19970000), vol. 186, page 1373 | - J. Immunol., (19940000), vol. 152, page 2968 | - Science, (19910000), vol. 253, page 1129 | - J. Biol. Chem., (19970000), vol. 272, page 17400 | - Circulation, (20000000), vol. 101, page 1158 | - Structure, (20000000), vol. 8, page 385 | - J. Rheumatology, (19980000), vol. 25, page 2065 | - J. Clin. Microbiol., (19990000), vol. 37, page 396 | - PAULSON et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19890000), vol. 264, page 17619 | - Genes Develop., (19900000), vol. 4, page 1288 | - Tailoring Recombinant Protein Quality by Rational Media DesignBiotechnol. Prog., (20150000), vol. 31, no. 3, pages 615 - 629 | US19930627547 |