EP3875439 - SEALING GLASS COMPOSITION AND SOLID OXIDE FUEL CELL USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-Gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2021/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Namjin IP Center, LG Electronics Inc., 51, Gasan digital 1-ro Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Young Seok IP Center, LG Electronics Inc., 51, Gasan digital 1-ro Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | 03 /
IM, Sanghyeok LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2021/36] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2021/36] | Application number, filing date | 19878795.4 | 01.11.2019 | [2021/36] | WO2019KR14753 | Priority number, date | KR20180133551 | 02.11.2018 Original published format: KR 20180133551 | [2021/36] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020091528 | Date: | 07.05.2020 | Language: | KO | [2020/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3875439 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3875439 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C03C8/24, C03C3/064, H01M8/0282, H01M8/124 | [2021/36] | CPC: |
H01M8/12 (EP,US);
C03C8/24 (EP,KR,US);
C03C3/068 (EP,US);
C03C3/064 (EP,KR);
C03C3/066 (EP);
H01M8/0282 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DICHTUNGSGLASZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND DIESE VERWENDENDE FESTOXIDBRENNSTOFFZELLE | [2021/36] | English: | SEALING GLASS COMPOSITION AND SOLID OXIDE FUEL CELL USING SAME | [2021/36] | French: | COMPOSITION DE VERRE D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ ET PILE À COMBUSTIBLE À OXYDE SOLIDE L'UTILISANT | [2021/36] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2021 | Translation filed | 28.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 28.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/36] | 06.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009318278 (MAYUMI YOSHITAKA [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0004] , [0015]; tables 1-4 *; | [I]EP2403044 (CORNING INC [US]) [I] 1-10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0009] , [0010] , [0013]; figure 1; claim 9; table 3 *; | [I]US9296644 (SCHOEN BASTIAN [DE]) [I] 1-10 * abstract; columns 1,2,; examples 1-6; table 1 *; | [A] - I. W. DONALD ET AL, "Recent developments in the preparation, characterization and applications of glass- and glass-ceramic-to-metal seals and coatings", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS SCIENCE, (20110401), vol. 46, no. 7, doi:10.1007/s10853-010-5095-y, ISSN 0022-2461, pages 1975 - 2000, XP055063347 [A] 1-10 * example G18; 23; tables 2,3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10853-010-5095-y | International search | [A]KR19990049582 (SSANGYONG CEMENT INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.) [A] 1-10* See the entire document. *; | [A]KR20090052566 (MYONGJI UNIV IND & ACAD COOP [KR]) [A] 1-10 * See the entire document. *; | [A]KR101182379B (PHOENIX MATERIALS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-10 * See the entire document. *; | [Y]KR20150052017 (MO SCI CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * See abstract; claims 1,11; paragraphs [0019], [0022]-[0026], [0036]. *; | [Y]KR20150065739 (UNIV DANMARKS TEKNISKE [DK]) [Y] 1-10 * See claims 1, 8; paragraphs [0022]-[0023]. * |