Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020088189 | Global Dossier | 07.05.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018CN112429 | 29.10.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021385859 | Global Dossier | 09.12.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019CN109319 | 30.09.2019 | WO2018CN112429 | 29.10.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3874868 | Global Dossier | 13.07.2022 | A4 | EP3874868 | 08.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019CN109319 | 30.09.2019 | WO2018CN112429 | 29.10.2018 |