EP3874868 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR LBT OPTION SELECTION FOR WIDEBAND OPERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.07.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.08.2023 [2023/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2021/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Min Granitstigen 27 977 53 LULEA / SE | 02 /
LIU, Jinhua No.5 Lize East Street, Chaoyang District Beijing 100102 / CN | [2021/36] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2021/36] | Application number, filing date | 19879214.5 | 30.09.2019 | [2021/36] | WO2019CN109319 | Priority number, date | WO2018CN112429 | 29.10.2018 Original published format: PCT/CN2018/112429 | [2021/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020088189 | Date: | 07.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3874868 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, H04W16/14, H04W74/00 | [2022/28] | CPC: |
H04W74/006 (EP);
H04W74/002 (US);
H04W16/14 (EP);
H04W72/21 (US);
H04W74/0816 (US);
H04W74/0841 (US)
|
Former IPC [2021/36] | H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/36] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR LBT-OPTIONSAUSWAHL FÜR BREITBANDBETRIEB | [2021/36] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR LBT OPTION SELECTION FOR WIDEBAND OPERATION | [2021/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE SÉLECTION D'OPTIONS LBT POUR UNE OPÉRATION À LARGE BANDE | [2021/36] | Entry into regional phase | 16.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 16.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 16.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/36] | 28.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2016302076 (CHOU CHIE-MING [TW], et al); | [XAI]US2018042048 (HUGL KLAUS [AT], et al); |