EP3874027 - METHODS FOR HEMATOPOIETIC STEM AND PROGENITOR CELL TRANSPLANT THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.06.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Magenta Therapeutics, Inc. 100 Technology Square Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | [2021/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAFFEL, Glen 100 Technology Square Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | [2021/36] | Representative(s) | Russell, Tim, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2021/36] | Application number, filing date | 19879239.2 | 31.10.2019 | [2021/36] | WO2019US59039 | Priority number, date | US201862753865P | 31.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862753865 P | US201962860866P | 13.06.2019 Original published format: US 201962860866 P | [2021/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2020092694 | Date: | 07.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3874027 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/0789, A61K35/12, A61K35/28, A61K31/255, A61K31/4015, A61K31/5377, A61K38/13, A61K35/51, A61K39/395, A61K45/06, A61P37/00, C07K16/28, A61K31/675 | [2022/32] | CPC: |
A61K35/28 (EP,US);
A61K31/255 (EP,US);
A61K31/4015 (EP,US);
A61K31/5377 (EP,US);
A61K31/675 (EP,US);
A61K35/51 (EP);
A61K38/13 (EP,US);
A61K39/3955 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
C07K16/18 (US);
C07K16/28 (EP);
C12N5/0647 (US);
A61K31/185 (US);
C07K2319/73 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/255, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/4015, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/5377, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/675, A61K2300/00 (EP); |
Former IPC [2021/36] | C12N5/0789, A61K35/12, A61K35/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/36] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN FÜR HÄMATOPOIETISCHE STAMM- UND VORLÄUFERZELLTRANSPLANTATIONSTHERAPIE | [2021/36] | English: | METHODS FOR HEMATOPOIETIC STEM AND PROGENITOR CELL TRANSPLANT THERAPY | [2021/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE THÉRAPIE DE TRANSPLANTATION DE CELLULES SOUCHES ET PROGÉNITRICES HÉMATOPOÏÉTIQUES | [2021/36] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 17.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/36] | 16.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/29] | 28.02.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2014114070 (BOITANO ANTHONY E [US], et al) [Y] 9,11,14 * columns 1-2; claim 1 *; | [Y] - PAGE K M ET AL, "Posttransplant Autoimmune Hemolytic Anemia and Other Autoimmune Cytopenias are Increased in Very Young Infants Undergoing Unrelated Donor Umbilical Cord Blood Transplantation", BIOLOGY OF BLOOD AND MARROW TRANSPLANTATION, KLUGE CARDEN JENNINGS PUBLISHING, CHARLOTTESVILLE, VA, US, vol. 14, no. 10, doi:10.1016/J.BBMT.2008.07.006, ISSN 1083-8791, (20081001), pages 1108 - 1117, (20080917), XP025431765 [Y] 1-15 * page 1109 - page 1112 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbmt.2008.07.006 | [Y] - VERMYLEN C ET AL, "Haematopoietic stem cell transplantation for sickle cell anaemia: the first 50 patients transplanted in Belgium", BONE MARROW TRANSPLANTATION, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, GB, vol. 22, no. 1, doi:10.1038/SJ.BMT.1701291, ISSN 0268-3369, (19980629), pages 1 - 6, (19980629), XP037753812 [Y] 1-15 * page 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.bmt.1701291 | [Y] - WAGNER JOHN E ET AL, "Phase 2 Trials with Mgta-456, Single Cord Blood Units (CBU) Expanded with an Aryl Hydrocarbon Receptor (AHR) Antagonist, Demonstrate Uniform Engraftment and Rapid Hematopoietic Recovery in Patients Following Myeloablative or Non-Myeloablative Conditioning", BLOOD, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY, US, (20171208), vol. 130, doi:10.1182/BLOOD.V130.SUPPL_1.662.662, ISSN 0006-4971, page 662, XP086633903 [Y] 1-15 * page 662 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood.V130.Suppl_1.662.662 | International search | [A]WO9820932 (BAXTER INT [US], et al) [A] 1-2, 18/1-2* ; page 5, lines 23-27 *; | [XY]WO9925367 (GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US], et al) [X] 3 * ; page 4, lines 11-16; page 16, lines 9-11; page 45, lines 23-29; claim 6 * [Y] 18/3; | [XY]WO2018136606 (PAPAYANNOPOULOU THALIA [US], et al) [X] 5-7, 10-12 * ; paragraphs [0025], [0028], [0066]; claims 1, 11 * [Y] 13-14, 18/5-7, 18/10-14; | [XY] - XU, L et al., "The Consensus on Indications, Conditioning Regimen, and Donor Selection of Allogeneic Hematopoietic Cell Transplantation for Hematological Diseases in China - Recommendations from the Chinese Society of Hematology", Journal of Hematology and Oncology, (20180302), vol. 11, no. 33, pages 1 - 17, XP055716468 [X] 15 * ; page 6, column 2, paragraph 2; page 10, column 1, paragraph 3; table 3; DOI: 10.1186/s13045-018-0564-x * [Y] 16-17, 18/15-17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/s13045-018-0564-x | [Y] - FAULKNER, L et al., "ATG vs Thiotepa with Busulfan and Cyclophosphamide in Matched-Related Bone Marrow Transplantation for Thalassemia", Blood Advances, (20170523), vol. 1, no. 13, pages 792 - 801, XP055716469 [Y] 13-14, 16-17, 18/13-14, 18/16-17 * ; abstract; page 793, column 2, paragraph 3; DOI: 10.1182/bloodadvances.2016004119 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/bloodadvances.2016004119 | [Y] - HARRIS, LM et al., "Busulfan, Cyclophosphamide, and Antithymocyte Globulin Followed by Donor Stem Cell Transplant in Treating Patients with Hematologic Cancer", clinicaltrials.gov, (20180403), pages 1 - 9, URL: https://clinicaltrials.gov/ct2/show/NCT00611351, XP055716476 [Y] 14, 17, 18/14, 18/17 * ; page 3/9, paragraph 5 - page 4/9, paragraph 1 * | [Y] - BARTELINK, IH et al., "Association between Busulfan Exposure and Outcome in Children Receiving Intravenous Busulfan before Hematologic Stem Cell Transplantation", Biology Bone Marrow Transplant, (20090000), vol. 15, doi:10.1016/j.bbmt.2008.11.022, pages 231 - 241, XP026004660 [Y] 16, 18/16 * ; abstract; table 2; DOt:10.1016/j.bbmt.2008.11.022 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbmt.2008.11.022 | [Y] - MOHTY, M et al., "New Directions for Rabbit Antithymocyte Globulin (Thymoglobulin) in Solid Organ Transplants, Stem Cell Transplants and Autoimmunity", Drugs, (20140900), vol. 74, no. 14, pages 1605 - 1634, XP055716478 [Y] 16-17, 18/16-17 * ; page 1607, column 1, paragraph 1; DOI: 10.1 007/s40265-014-0277-6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s40265-014-0277-6 | [Y] - BARI, S et al., "Ex Vivo Expansion of CD 34+ CD 90+ CD 49f+ Hematopoietic Stem and Progenitor Cells from Non-Enriched Umbilical Cord Blood with Azole Compounds", Stem Cells Translational Medicine, (20180500), vol. 7, no. 5, doi:10.1002/sctm.17-0251, pages 376 - 393, XP055664746 [Y] 18/3, 18/5-7, 18/10-17 * ; abstract; page 391, column 2, paragraph 1 - page 392, column 1, paragraph 2; figure 5B; DOI: 10.1002/sctm.17-0251 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/sctm.17-0251 | [A] - GRATWOHL, A et al., "Autografting: Autologous Hematopoietic Stem Cell Transplantation for Autoimmune Diseases", Bone Marrow Transplantation, (20050500), vol. 35, no. 9, pages 869 - 879, XP055716498 [A] 1-2, 18/1-2 * ; page 870, column 2, paragraph 2; page 871, column 1, paragraph 1; DOI: 10.1 038/sj .bmt.1704892 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.bmt.1704892 | [A] - HWANG-BO, S et al., "Treatment and Response of Autoimmune Cytopenia Occurring after Allogeneic Hematopoietic Cell Transplantation in Children", Blood Research, (20170600), vol. 52, no. 2, pages 119 - 124, XP055717007 [A] 1-2, 18/1-2 * ; abstract; page 120, column 1, paragraphs 3-4; DOI: 10.5045/br.2017.52.2.119 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.5045/br.2017.52.2.119 |