EP3876192 - IMAGE RECOGNITION METHOD AND DEVICE, TERMINAL APPARATUS, AND MEDICAL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tencent Technology (Shenzhen) Company Limited 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong, 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2022/29] | For all designated states Tencent Technology (Shenzhen) Company Limited 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen City, Guangdong 518057 / CN | ||
Former [2021/36] | For all designated states Tencent Technology (Shenzhen) Company Limited 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen City, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FU, Xinghui 35/F, Tencent Building, Kejizhongyi Road, Midwest District of Hi-tech park Nanshan District Shenzhen City, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
SUN, Zhongqian 35/F, Tencent Building, Kejizhongyi Road, Midwest District of Hi-tech park Nanshan District Shenzhen City, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
SHANG, Hong 35/F, Tencent Building, Kejizhongyi Road, Midwest District of Hi-tech park Nanshan District Shenzhen City, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 04 /
YANG, Wei 35/F, Tencent Building, Kejizhongyi Road, Midwest District of Hi-tech park Nanshan District Shenzhen City, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2021/36] | Representative(s) | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/36] | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19879486.9 | 28.06.2019 | [2021/36] | WO2019CN93602 | Priority number, date | CN201811278418 | 30.10.2018 Original published format: CN201811278418 | [2021/36] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020087960 | Date: | 07.05.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3876192 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/00 | [2021/36] | CPC: |
G06T7/0012 (EP,CN,US);
G06N3/045 (EP);
G06N3/08 (EP,US);
G06T7/11 (US);
G06V10/50 (EP,US);
G06T2207/20021 (EP,CN);
G06T2207/20081 (EP,CN);
G06T2207/20084 (EP,CN,US);
G06T2207/30092 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/36] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BILDERKENNUNG, ENDGERÄT UND MEDIZINISCHES SYSTEM | [2021/36] | English: | IMAGE RECOGNITION METHOD AND DEVICE, TERMINAL APPARATUS, AND MEDICAL SYSTEM | [2021/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE RECONNAISSANCE D'IMAGE, APPAREIL TERMINAL ET SYSTÈME MÉDICAL | [2021/36] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2020 | Translation filed | 16.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 16.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/36] | 30.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]CN108305249 (UNIV FUJIAN); | International search | [A]CN107609503 (LIU YUHONG, et al) [A] 1-20 * see entire document *; | [X]CN108573490 (WANG CHENGYAN, et al) [X] 1-20 * description, paragraphs [0009]-[0060], and figures 1-8 *; | [A]WO2018189551 (KHEIRON MEDICAL TECH LTD [GB]) [A] 1-20 * see entire document *; | [PX]CN109427060 (TENCENT TECH SHENZHEN CO LTD) [PX] 1-20* see entire document * |