EP3873596 - LIGHT THERAPY TREATMENT METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WAYNE STATE UNIVERSITY 4032 Faculty Administrative Building 656 West Kirby Detroit, Michigan 48202 / US | [2021/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUETTEMANN, Maik 1128 Lakepointe Street Grosse Pointe Park, Michigan 48230 / US | 02 /
RECANATI, Maurice-Andre 315 West 70th St., 16th Floor New York, New York 10023 / US | 03 /
SANDERSON, Thomas H. 48566 Harvest Drive Plymouth, Michigan 48170 / US | [2021/36] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/36] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 19879573.4 | 31.10.2019 | [2021/36] | WO2019US59103 | Priority number, date | US201862753278P | 31.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862753278 P | [2021/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020092729 | Date: | 07.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3873596 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 07.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/06, A61B18/20, // A61N5/00 | [2022/30] | CPC: |
A61N5/0616 (EP,US);
A61N5/0613 (EP,AU);
A61B18/20 (AU);
A61N5/0601 (EP,AU);
A61N5/0603 (EP,US);
A61N5/062 (US);
B32B27/065 (US);
B32B27/32 (US);
E04F15/02 (US);
E04F15/107 (US);
E04F15/187 (US);
E04F15/206 (US);
E04F15/22 (US);
A61B2018/1807 (AU);
A61N2005/005 (EP);
A61N2005/063 (EP,US);
A61N2005/0644 (EP);
A61N2005/0645 (EP);
A61N2005/0647 (EP);
A61N2005/0648 (EP);
A61N2005/0651 (AU);
A61N2005/0652 (EP,US);
A61N2005/0659 (EP,AU,US);
A61N2005/0663 (US);
E04B2001/8461 (US);
E04B9/045 (US);
E04F2201/0107 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/36] | A61N5/06, A61B18/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/36] | Title | German: | LICHTTHERAPIEBEHANDLUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2021/36] | English: | LIGHT THERAPY TREATMENT METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2021/36] | French: | MÉTHODE ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT PAR LUMINOTHÉRAPIE | [2021/36] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 27.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/36] | 16.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2003181962 (STREETER JACKSON [US]); | [X]US2015246240 (HUTTEMANN MAIK [US], et al) | International search | [X]DE4143168 (REHA TEC VERTRIEBSGES FUER MED [DE]) [X] 1 to 67 * see Abstract; Claims and Figures and related text *; | [X]WO0057804 (GERDES HAROLD M [US]) [X] 46 to 49, 55 to 56, 58 to 60 and 66 * see Abstract; Claims; Figures and related text *; | [X]RU2179043 (SIB MED UNI) [X] 1 to 67 * see Abstract; Claim and Paragraphs [0001]-[0031] *; | [X]US2002198575 (SULLIVAN JANA [US]) [X] 46 to 67 * see Abstract; Claims and Paragraphs [0003], [0009]-[0017], [0027]-[0069]; Figures *; | [A]RU2261130 (OMSK STATE MEDICAL ACAD) [A] 1 to 67 * see Abstract *; | [X]CN201832290U (B & W TEK OPTO ELECTRONICS EQUIPMENT CO LTD) [X] 46 to 49 and 58 to 60 * see Abstract; Claims; Figures and related text *; | [X]CN102553086 (SUZHOU INST BIOMED ENG & TECH) [X] 1 to 67 * see Abstract; Figures *; | [A]US2013344454 (NATH GUENTHER [DE]) [A] 1 to 67 * see Abstract; Figures and related text *; | [X]WO2014131115 (KLOX TECHNOLOGIES INC [CA]) [X] 46 to 67 * see Abstract; Claims; Figures and related text *; | [X]WO2016040534 (LUMITHERA INC [US]) [X] 1 to 67 * see Abstract; Claims; Figures; Paragraphs [0002]-[00025], [00077]-[000446]) *; | [X]US2016192988 (ALBRIGHT RICHARD [US]) [X] 46 to 67 * see Abstract; Claims; Figures and related text *; | [A]AU2016277709 (RENUDE LASER PTY LTD [AU]) [A] 1 to 67 * see Abstract; Figures and related text; Claims *; | [A]US2018093107 (BALL ANTHONY [US]) [A] 1 to 67 * see Abstract; Figures and related text; Claims *; | [X]WO2018191637 (MULTI RADIANCE MEDICAL [US]) [X] 1 to 67 * see Abstract; Claims; Figures and related text *; | [PX]WO2019090159 (LUMITHERA INC [US]) [PX] 1 to 67* see Abstract; Figures and related text *; | [PX]US10478635 (NELSON SCOTT [US], et al) [PX] 1 to 67 * see Abstract; Figures and related text * |