EP3753400 - PET CLAW CLIPPER INCLUDING LED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lee, Bo Ra (Hwajeongdong) 50-11, Hwajeong-ro 179beon-gil Seo-gu Gwangju 61987 / KR | [2020/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2020/52] | Representative(s) | SJW Patentanwälte Goethestraße 21 80336 München / DE | [2023/22] |
Former [2020/52] | Scheele, Friedrich RatnerPrestia Altheimer Eck 2 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19881428.7 | 20.03.2019 | [2020/52] | WO2019KR03211 | Priority number, date | KR20180136307 | 08.11.2018 Original published format: KR 20180136307 | KR20180170277 | 27.12.2018 Original published format: KR 20180170277 | [2020/52] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020096143 | Date: | 14.05.2020 | Language: | KO | [2020/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3753400 | Date: | 23.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3753400 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A01K13/00, A45D29/02 | [2021/47] | CPC: |
A01K13/00 (EP,KR);
A01K17/00 (US);
A01K29/00 (KR);
A45D29/02 (EP,US);
F21V33/0004 (KR);
F21Y2115/10 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2020/52] | A01K13/00, A01K29/00, F21V33/00, F21Y115/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHNEIDVORRICHTUNG FÜR HAUSTIERKLAUEN MIT LED | [2020/52] | English: | PET CLAW CLIPPER INCLUDING LED | [2020/52] | French: | COUPE-GRIFFES POUR ANIMAL DE COMPAGNIE COMPRENANT UNE DEL | [2020/52] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2020 | Translation filed | 17.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 17.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/52] | 13.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.05.2023 | CZ | 31.05.2023 | DK | 31.05.2023 | EE | 31.05.2023 | ES | 31.05.2023 | FI | 31.05.2023 | HR | 31.05.2023 | IT | 31.05.2023 | LT | 31.05.2023 | LV | 31.05.2023 | NL | 31.05.2023 | PL | 31.05.2023 | RO | 31.05.2023 | RS | 31.05.2023 | SE | 31.05.2023 | SI | 31.05.2023 | SK | 31.05.2023 | SM | 31.05.2023 | NO | 31.08.2023 | GR | 01.09.2023 | IS | 30.09.2023 | PT | 02.10.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/25] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
CZ | 31.05.2023 | ||
DK | 31.05.2023 | ||
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SI | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
PT | 02.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
CZ | 31.05.2023 | ||
DK | 31.05.2023 | ||
EE | 31.05.2023 | ||
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RO | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
PT | 02.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
SK | 31.05.2023 | ||
SM | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
FI | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LT | 31.05.2023 | ||
LV | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
NL | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
HR | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
RS | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
PL | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.09.2023 | ||
IS | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 31.05.2023 | |
ES | 31.05.2023 | ||
SE | 31.05.2023 | ||
NO | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 31.05.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2005210679 (MOULTON REYNOLDS E III [US]) [Y] 1-3,6 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0028]; figures 1-8 * [A] 4,5,7; | [A]US2006042559 (KANG SUNG B [KR]) [A] 1-7* the whole document *; | [YA]US2017035027 (KIM YIJUNG [US]) [Y] 1-3,6 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0014]; figures 1, 2 * [A] 4,5,7 | International search | [A]KR19980032254U [A] 1-7; | [Y]KR200376975Y [Y] 7; | [A]JP2006006294 (HIMEJI NEW PINE KK) [A] 1-7; | [Y]KR20090002311U [Y] 4; | [XY]KR20180072047 (DESIGN NID CORP [KR]) [X] 1-3, 5-6 [Y] 4, 7 | by applicant | KR200376975Y |