EP3879575 - LIGHT EMITTING DEVICE STRUCTURE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.08.2021 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 1, Samsung-ro, Giheung-Gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-Do 17113 / KR | [2021/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHO, Hyun Min 402, 2614, Nambusunhwan-ro Seocho-Gu Seoul 18505 / KR | 02 /
MIN, Jung Hong 96, Duri-gil, Paengseong-eup Pyeongtaek-Si Gyeonggi-do 18000 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Dae Hyun 146-1603, 231, Dongtanbanseok-ro Hwaseong-Si Gyeonggi-do 18447 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Dong Uk 3041-1604, 22, Dongtansunhwan-daero 7-gil Hwaseong-Si Gyeonggi-do 18505 / KR | [2021/37] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/37] | Shearman, James Ward Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | Application number, filing date | 19881430.3 | 27.05.2019 | [2021/37] | WO2019KR06327 | Priority number, date | KR20180135067 | 06.11.2018 Original published format: KR 20180135067 | [2021/37] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020096150 | Date: | 14.05.2020 | Language: | KO | [2020/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3879575 | Date: | 15.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/08, H01L33/38, H01L33/42, H01L33/20, H01L33/16, H01L33/00 | [2022/31] | CPC: |
H01L33/20 (EP);
H01L27/156 (KR,US);
H01L33/62 (KR,US);
H01L33/005 (EP,KR,US);
H01L33/08 (EP);
H01L33/14 (KR);
H01L33/16 (EP,KR,US);
H01L33/38 (EP,KR,US);
H01L33/42 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/37] | H01L27/15, H01L33/14, H01L33/38, H01L33/62, H01L33/16, H01L33/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/37] | Title | German: | AUFBAU EINER LICHTEMITTIERENDEN VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2021/37] | English: | LIGHT EMITTING DEVICE STRUCTURE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | [2021/37] | French: | STRUCTURE DE DISPOSITIF ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2021/37] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2021 | Translation filed | 06.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 06.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/37] | 20.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2008157057 (KIM HWA MOK [KR]) [X] 1-3,6-11,16,17 * paragraphs [0029] - [0073]; figures 1-7 *[I] 4,5,12-15,18,19; | [XI]US2012132888 (KWAK WOO CHUL [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,10,11,16,17 * paragraphs [0028] - [0078]; figures 4,5 * [I] 4-9,12-15,18,19 | International search | [A]JP2002344055 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0023]-[0044] and figures 5-15. *; | [XY]KR20040008962 (VICHEL INC) [X] 1-3, 11-12 * See pages 3-5 and figures 1-2e. * [Y] 4-10, 13-20; | [Y]KR20080019912 (SAMSUNG ELECTRO MECH [KR]) [Y] 6, 17-20 * See paragraph [0054] and figure 2. *; | [Y]KR20110123118 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 4-6, 13-16, 19-20 * See paragraph [0041] and figures 1-2. *; | [Y]KR20120122160 (KOOKNHN UNIVERSITY INDUSTRY ACADEMY COOPERATION FOUNDATION et al.) [Y] 7-10 * See paragraph [0061] and figure 8. *; | [A]KR102012010B (KOREA ADVANCED NANO FAB CENTER) [A] 1-20* See paragraphs [0021]-[0045] and figures 2a-8. * |