EP3820454 - PHAGE MIMICKING NANOPARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.04.2021 Database last updated on 05.05.2025 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Notre Dame du Lac 1400 East Angela Boulevard. South Bend, IN 46617 / US | [2021/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NALLATHAMBY, Prakash Daniel 50685 Mercury Drive Granger, Indiana 46530 / US | 02 /
HOPF, Juliane 50685 Mercury Drive Granger, Indiana 46530 / US | [2021/20] | Representative(s) | Hepworth Browne 15 St. Pauls Street Leeds LS1 2JG / GB | [2021/20] | Application number, filing date | 19881667.0 | 07.11.2019 | [2021/20] | WO2019US60202 | Priority number, date | US201862757086P | 07.11.2018 Original published format: US 201862757086 P | US201962869648P | 02.07.2019 Original published format: US 201962869648 P | [2021/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020097288 | Date: | 14.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3820454 | Date: | 19.05.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61K33/00, A61K33/242, A61K33/38, A61K47/69, A61P31/04, B82Y5/00, B82Y40/00 | [2023/11] | CPC: |
A61K47/6923 (EP,US);
A61K47/6929 (EP,US);
A61K33/00 (EP);
A61K33/242 (EP,US);
A61K33/38 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K33/00, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K33/242, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K33/38, A61K2300/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/20] | A61K9/14, A61K33/242, A61K33/38, A61P31/04, B82B1/00, B82Y5/00, B82Y40/00, G01N21/65, G01N33/58 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/20] | Title | German: | PHAGEN-NACHAHMENDE NANOTEILCHEN | [2021/20] | English: | PHAGE MIMICKING NANOPARTICLES | [2021/20] | French: | NANOPARTICULES IMITANT UN PHAGE | [2021/20] | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 11.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/20] | 23.06.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | 24.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2021 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.08.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2003108612 (XU XIAOHONG NANCY [US], et al); | [A]KR20130042363 (UNIV SOONGSIL RES CONSORTIUM [KR], et al); | [A]KR20130118086 (SNU R&DB FOUNDATION [KR]); |