Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3877995
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
29.04.2024 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
01.12.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.11.2023 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
02.10.2023 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.05.2023 |
First examination report |
|
25.05.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
02.12.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.08.2022 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
19.01.2022 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
14.01.2022 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
14.01.2022 |
Change - extension states |
published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
24.12.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 26.01.2022 [2022/04] |
24.12.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 26.01.2022 [2022/04] |
01.12.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.08.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] |
13.08.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] |
19.07.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.07.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.06.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.06.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
07.06.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
07.06.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.05.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.05.2020 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|