EP3858240 - INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE AND METHOD, AND RADIOGRAPHY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2021/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NODA, Takeshi c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2021/31] | Representative(s) | WESER & Kollegen Patentanwälte PartmbB Radeckestraße 43 81245 München / DE | [2021/31] | Application number, filing date | 19882439.3 | 01.10.2019 | [2021/31] | WO2019JP38717 | Priority number, date | JP20180211700 | 09.11.2018 Original published format: JP 2018211700 | [2021/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020095578 | Date: | 14.05.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3858240 | Date: | 04.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3858240 | Date: | 29.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/00 | [2021/31] | CPC: |
A61B6/482 (EP,US);
A61B6/12 (US);
A61B6/405 (US);
A61B6/4085 (US);
A61B6/4241 (US);
A61B6/4283 (US);
A61B6/463 (US);
A61B6/465 (US);
A61B6/481 (EP,US);
A61B6/486 (US);
A61B6/487 (US);
A61B6/504 (US);
A61B6/5205 (EP,US);
A61B6/5211 (US);
A61B6/5217 (EP,US);
G06T7/0012 (US);
G06T2207/10116 (US);
G06T2207/30008 (US);
G06T2207/30096 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN UND RADIOGRAFIESYSTEM | [2021/31] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE AND METHOD, AND RADIOGRAPHY SYSTEM | [2021/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS ET SYSTÈME DE RADIOGRAPHIE | [2021/31] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2021 | Translation filed | 28.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 28.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/31] | 20.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.03.2023 | CZ | 29.03.2023 | DK | 29.03.2023 | EE | 29.03.2023 | ES | 29.03.2023 | FI | 29.03.2023 | HR | 29.03.2023 | IT | 29.03.2023 | LT | 29.03.2023 | LV | 29.03.2023 | MC | 29.03.2023 | NL | 29.03.2023 | PL | 29.03.2023 | RO | 29.03.2023 | RS | 29.03.2023 | SE | 29.03.2023 | SI | 29.03.2023 | SK | 29.03.2023 | SM | 29.03.2023 | NO | 29.06.2023 | GR | 30.06.2023 | IS | 29.07.2023 | PT | 31.07.2023 | GB | 01.10.2023 | LU | 01.10.2023 | BE | 31.10.2023 | CH | 31.10.2023 | FR | 31.10.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
CZ | 29.03.2023 | ||
DK | 29.03.2023 | ||
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
MC | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
PL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SI | 29.03.2023 | ||
SK | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
GB | 01.10.2023 | ||
LU | 01.10.2023 | ||
CH | 31.10.2023 | ||
FR | 31.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
CZ | 29.03.2023 | ||
DK | 29.03.2023 | ||
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
MC | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
PL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SI | 29.03.2023 | ||
SK | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
GB | 01.10.2023 | ||
LU | 01.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/30] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
CZ | 29.03.2023 | ||
DK | 29.03.2023 | ||
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
MC | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
PL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SI | 29.03.2023 | ||
SK | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
LU | 01.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
CZ | 29.03.2023 | ||
DK | 29.03.2023 | ||
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
MC | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
PL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SI | 29.03.2023 | ||
SK | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
CZ | 29.03.2023 | ||
DK | 29.03.2023 | ||
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
PL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SI | 29.03.2023 | ||
SK | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
CZ | 29.03.2023 | ||
DK | 29.03.2023 | ||
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
PL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SI | 29.03.2023 | ||
SK | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
CZ | 29.03.2023 | ||
DK | 29.03.2023 | ||
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
PL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SK | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
PL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SK | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 29.03.2023 | |
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | FI | 29.03.2023 | |
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 29.03.2023 | |
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 29.03.2023 | |
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 29.03.2023 | |
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 29.03.2023 | |
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 29.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0549858 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * page 4, lines 27-28 * * page 7, lines 21,24 * * page 10, lines 27-32,25 * * equations 9-25 * * page 6, line 10 * * page 10, line 28 *; | [AD]JPH08178873 (TOKYO METROPOLITAN GOV, et al) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2011217805 (SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0023] , [0051] *; | [A]JP2016145778 (JOBU:KK) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]CN108181326 (NUCTECH CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2018263576 (KONNO YASUTAKA [JP]) [A] 1-15 * figure 17 *; | [E]US2021007691 (PRABHU VERLEKER AKSHAY NARAYAN [JP], et al) [E] 1,13,14* the whole document *; | [A] - PIER LUCA ROSSI ET AL, "Imaging characterization of a multi-energy CT with quasi-monochromatic X-ray source", NUCLEAR SCIENCE SYMPOSIUM AND MEDICAL IMAGING CONFERENCE (NSS/MIC), 2011 IEEE, IEEE, (20111023), doi:10.1109/NSSMIC.2011.6152499, ISSN 1082-3654, ISBN 978-1-4673-0118-3, pages 2832 - 2835, XP032116761 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/NSSMIC.2011.6152499 | International search | [Y]JP2008142435 (GE MED SYS GLOBAL TECH CO LLC) [Y] 8-11* , paragraphs [0037]-[0039] (Family: none) *; | [XYA]JP2011217805 (SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES) [X] 1, 12-13, 15- 16 * , paragraphs [0044]-[0064] (Family: none) * [Y] 6, 11 [A] 2-5, 14; | [Y]WO2017073399 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [Y] 8-1 * , paragraph [0003] & US 2018/0263576 A1, paragraph [0003] & CN 108135560 A *; | [Y]JP2018015664 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [Y] 6, 7 * , paragraph [0108] & US 2013/0101089 A1, paragraph [0137] & WO 2013/058567 A1 & EP 2583625 A1 & KR 10-2013-0043974 A & CN 103054601 A & BR 112014009735 A * | by applicant | JPH05237081 | JPH08178873 | JP20180211700 |