EP3877524 - MODIFIED DOUBLE STRANDED OLIGONUCLEOTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.08.2021 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alnylam Pharmaceuticals Inc. 300 Third Street, 3rd Floor Cambridge MA 02142 / US | [2021/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOSTER, Donald c/o Alnylam Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 300 Third Street, Third Floor Cambridge, Massachusetts 02142 / US | 02 /
SCHLEGEL, Mark K. c/o Alnylam Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 300 Third Street, Third Floor Cambridge, Massachusetts 02142 / US | 03 /
BROWN, Christopher c/o Alnylam Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 300 Third Street, Third Floor Cambridge, Massachusetts 02142 / US | [2021/37] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2021/37] | Application number, filing date | 19882543.2 | 05.11.2019 | [2021/37] | WO2019US59818 | Priority number, date | US201862758094P | 09.11.2018 Original published format: US 201862758094 P | [2021/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020097044 | Date: | 14.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3877524 | Date: | 15.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/113, C12N15/09, A61K31/713 | [2021/37] | CPC: |
C12N15/111 (EP);
C12N15/113 (EP,US);
A61K31/713 (EP);
C12N2310/11 (US);
C12N2310/14 (EP);
C12N2310/315 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C12N2310/322, C12N2310/3531 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/37] | Title | German: | MODIFIZIERTE DOPPELSTRÄNGIGE OLIGONUKLEOTIDE | [2021/37] | English: | MODIFIED DOUBLE STRANDED OLIGONUCLEOTIDES | [2021/37] | French: | OLIGONUCLÉOTIDES DOUBLE BRIN MODIFIÉS | [2021/37] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 06.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/37] | 05.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2018062510 (UNIV NAT CORP TOKYO MEDICAL & DENTAL [JP]); | [A]WO2018098117 (ALNYLAM PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]); | [IP]EP3521430 (UNIV NAT CORP TOKYO MEDICAL & DENTAL [JP]); | International search | [Y]US2012157509 (HADWIGER PHILIPP [DE], et al); | [XY]US2018201929 (BUTLER JAMES [US], et al) |