Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
11.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
14.07.2023 | Change - representative | |
06.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
16.09.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
03.08.2022 | Supplementary search report | published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] |
29.07.2022 | Change - classification | published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] |
29.07.2022 | Change - classification | published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] |
22.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant | |
22.10.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
13.08.2021 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] |
13.08.2021 | Request for examination filed | published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] |
02.06.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
11.05.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
11.05.2021 | New entry: Fee payment for validation state | |
11.05.2021 | New entry: Fee payment for extension state | |
07.05.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
05.05.2021 | Change - representative | |
05.05.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
01.05.2021 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
16.05.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
16.05.2020 | New entry: applicant or inventor |