EP3876999 - NEGATIVELY CHARGED PEG-LIPID CONJUGATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.08.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arbutus Biopharma Corporation 100- 8900 Glenlyon Parkway Burnaby, BC V5J 5J8 / CA | [2021/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEYES, James 100-8900 Glenlyon Parkway Burnaby, British Columbia V5J 5J8 / CA | 02 /
LAM, Kieu Mong 100-8900 Glenlyon Parkway Burnaby, British Columbia V5J 5J8 / CA | 03 /
WOOD, Mark 100-8900 Glenlyon Parkway Burnaby, British Columbia V5J 5J8 / CA | [2021/37] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/37] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19883009.3 | 08.11.2019 | [2021/37] | WO2019US60518 | Priority number, date | US201862758099P | 09.11.2018 Original published format: US 201862758099 P | [2021/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020097493 | Date: | 14.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3876999 | Date: | 15.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/69, A61K47/10, C07C31/20, C07C53/00 | [2021/37] | CPC: |
A61K31/713 (EP);
A61K48/0033 (US);
A61K31/7105 (EP,US);
A61K47/543 (US);
A61K47/60 (US);
A61K48/0041 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/37] | Extension states | BA | 06.05.2021 | ME | 06.05.2021 | Validation states | KH | 06.05.2021 | MA | 06.05.2021 | MD | 06.05.2021 | TN | 06.05.2021 | Title | German: | NEGATIV GELADENE PEG-LIPID-KONJUGATE | [2021/37] | English: | NEGATIVELY CHARGED PEG-LIPID CONJUGATES | [2021/37] | French: | CONJUGUÉS PEG-LIPIDES CHARGÉS NÉGATIVEMENT | [2021/37] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 06.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/37] | 01.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2006240554 (CHEN TONGQIAN [US], et al); | [X]WO2007051303 (PROTIVA BIOTHERAPEUTICS INC [CA], et al) | International search | [A]US2005064595 (MACLACHLAN IAN [CA], et al); | [A]US2005175682 (HEYES JAMES [CA], et al); | [A]US2006008910 (MACLACHLAN IAN [CA], et al) |