EP3880564 - STACKABLE PALLET AND METHOD OF MAKING A PALLET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/38] | STACKABLE HALF-SIZE PLASTIC PALLET | ||
[2024/30] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.07.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHEP Technology Pty Limited Level 29 255 George Street Sydney, NSW 2000 / AU | [2023/26] |
Former [2021/38] | For all designated states CHEP Technology Pty Limited Level 10 Angel Place 123 Pitt Street Sydney, NSW 2000 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAUBENSPECK, Bradley Wayne 5825 Caymus Loop Windermere, Florida 34786 / US | 02 /
GORSKY, Daniel Aaron 256 Countryside Dr. Lebanon, Ohio 45036 / US | 03 /
NORMAN, Craig Rolland 1015 Garden Crossing Lane Cumming, Georgia 30040 / US | [2021/38] | Representative(s) | Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road Holborn London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/38] | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 19883440.0 | 11.11.2019 | [2021/38] | WO2019US60671 | Priority number, date | US201862760218P | 13.11.2018 Original published format: US 201862760218 P | US201916674087 | 05.11.2019 Original published format: US201916674087 | [2021/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020102047 | Date: | 22.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3880564 | Date: | 22.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B65D19/32, B65D19/42, B62B3/16 | [2022/34] | CPC: |
B65D19/0026 (EP);
B65D19/0071 (CN);
B65D19/0048 (US);
B62B3/008 (EP);
B62B3/16 (EP,US);
B62B5/0093 (EP,US);
B65D19/0012 (US);
B65D19/38 (CN,US);
B65D19/42 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00034 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00069 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00129 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00273 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00288 (EP);
B65D2519/00293 (CN);
B65D2519/00308 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00323 (EP);
B65D2519/00333 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00338 (US);
B65D2519/00402 (EP);
B65D2519/00407 (EP);
B65D2519/00412 (EP);
B65D2519/00437 (EP);
B65D2519/00442 (EP);
B65D2519/00567 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00756 (US);
B65D2519/00771 (EP);
B65D2519/00781 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00791 (EP);
B65D2519/00796 (EP);
B65D2519/00815 (EP,US);
B65D2519/0084 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00955 (US);
B65D2519/0096 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/38] | B65D19/00, B65D19/26, B65D19/38, B65D19/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/38] | Title | German: | STAPELBARE PALETTE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER PALETTE | [2024/30] | English: | STACKABLE PALLET AND METHOD OF MAKING A PALLET | [2024/30] | French: | PALETTE EMPILABLE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE PALETTE | [2024/30] |
Former [2021/38] | STAPELBARE KUNSTSTOFFPALETTE HALBER GRÖSSE | ||
Former [2021/38] | STACKABLE HALF-SIZE PLASTIC PALLET | ||
Former [2021/38] | PALETTE EN PLASTIQUE DEMI-TAILLE EMPILABLE | Entry into regional phase | 16.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 16.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 16.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/38] | 13.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS4924837Y ; | [Y]JPS52158467U ; | [A]JPS5996129U ; | [Y]JPH07137741 (POLYPLASTICS CO); | [IY]JP2002166941 (GIFU PLASTIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JP2003118739 (SANKO CO LTD); | [Y]ES1071497U (FERNANDEZ GUTIERREZ ANTON [ES]); | [XYI]JP2013107651 (SANKO CO LTD) | International search | [A]US2942825 (AKE TRAPP CARL) [A] 1-20* , entire document *; | [A]US3722430 (WOODLEY C, et al) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [YA]DE8310685U (CRAEMER PAUL GMBH & CO [DE]) [Y] 1-2, 4-6, 10, 12-15, 17-19 * , entire document * [A] 3, 7-9, 11, 16, 20; | [A]US5445084 (DURAND MICHEL G [FR]) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [A]US6357366 (FRANKENBERG JASON R [US]) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [A]JP2005263261 (SANKO CO LTD) [A] 3, 7-9, 16, 20 * , entire document *; | [YA]US6976436 (SUGIHARA JUNRO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-2, 4-6, 10, 12-15, 17-19 * , entire document * [A] 3, 7-9, 11, 16, 20; | [YA]JP2008308190 (SANKO CO LTD) [Y] 6, 19 * , entire document * [A] 7, 20; | [A]US2013220184 (APPS WILLIAM P [US], et al) [A] 11 * , entire document * |