EP3880085 - SURGICAL CLIP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teleflex Medical Incorporated 3015 Carrington Mill Boulevard Morrisville, North Carolina 27560 / US | [2021/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOSHEE, David Lee 4601 Thane Court Apex, North Carolina 27539 / US | 02 /
CASTRO, Salvatore 107 Zaharis Cove Raleigh, North Carolina 27603 / US | [2021/38] | Representative(s) | Jacob, Reuben Ellis, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/38] | Jacob, Reuben Ellis, et al Maucher Jenkins 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 19884321.1 | 15.11.2019 | [2021/38] | WO2019US61767 | Priority number, date | US201862768671P | 16.11.2018 Original published format: US 201862768671 P | [2021/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020102700 | Date: | 22.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3880085 | Date: | 22.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/122 | [2022/33] | CPC: |
A61B17/1227 (EP,KR);
A61B17/122 (KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2021/38] | A61B17/122, A61B17/068, A61B17/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/38] | Title | German: | CHIRURGISCHE KLAMMER | [2021/38] | English: | SURGICAL CLIP | [2021/38] | French: | AGRAFE CHIRURGICALE | [2021/38] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 20.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/38] | 16.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2005165422 (WILSON DONALD F JR [US]); | [A]US2007118161 (KENNEDY DANIEL L [US], et al); | [XP]WO2018237277 (TELEFLEX MEDICAL INC [US]) | International search | [A]US4834096 (OH SEIK [US], et al); | [X]US5160339 (CHEN CHAO C [US], et al); | [A]US5441509 (VIDAL CLAUDE [US], et al); | [A]US2018036008 (RAMSEY MICHAEL DELL [US], et al) |