EP3882996 - SECONDARY BATTERY AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/38] | SECONDARY BATTERY AND MANUFACTURING METHOD | ||
[2023/42] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Nihon Micronics 6-8, Kichijojihon-cho 2-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 1808508 / JP | [2021/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAITO, Tomokazu c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Nihon Micronics 6-8, Kichijojihon-cho 2-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8508 / JP | 02 /
KUDOH, Takuo c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Nihon Micronics 6-8, Kichijojihon-cho 2-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8508 / JP | [2021/38] | Representative(s) | INNOV-GROUP 209 Avenue Berthelot 69007 Lyon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/38] | INNOV-GROUP 310, avenue Berthelot 69372 Lyon Cedex 08 / FR | Application number, filing date | 19884580.2 | 07.11.2019 | [2021/38] | WO2019JP43733 | Priority number, date | JP20180212875 | 13.11.2018 Original published format: JP 2018212875 | [2021/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020100722 | Date: | 22.05.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3882996 | Date: | 22.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3882996 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/0562, H01M10/0585, H01M10/058, H01M4/48, H01M4/52 | [2023/42] | CPC: |
H01M4/483 (EP);
H10N99/00 (KR,US);
H01M10/4235 (US);
H01M10/0562 (EP);
H01M10/0585 (EP,US);
H01M14/00 (KR);
H01M4/366 (US);
H01M4/523 (EP);
H01M4/62 (US);
H01M50/434 (US);
H01M50/457 (US);
H01M2300/0071 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/38] | H01L49/00, H01M10/05, H01M10/0562, H01M10/058 | ||
Former IPC [2021/38] | H01L49/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2021/38] | English: | SECONDARY BATTERY AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR | [2023/42] | French: | BATTERIE SECONDAIRE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2021/38] |
Former [2021/38] | SECONDARY BATTERY AND MANUFACTURING METHOD | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2021 | Translation filed | 08.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 08.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/38] | 03.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 27.03.2024 | FI | 27.03.2024 | HR | 27.03.2024 | LT | 27.03.2024 | LV | 27.03.2024 | NL | 27.03.2024 | SE | 27.03.2024 | NO | 27.06.2024 | RS | 27.06.2024 | GR | 28.06.2024 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/37] | BG | 27.03.2024 | |
FI | 27.03.2024 | ||
HR | 27.03.2024 | ||
LT | 27.03.2024 | ||
LV | 27.03.2024 | ||
SE | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.06.2024 | ||
RS | 27.06.2024 | ||
GR | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | BG | 27.03.2024 | |
FI | 27.03.2024 | ||
HR | 27.03.2024 | ||
LT | 27.03.2024 | ||
LV | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.06.2024 | ||
RS | 27.06.2024 | ||
GR | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 27.03.2024 | |
FI | 27.03.2024 | ||
HR | 27.03.2024 | ||
LT | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.06.2024 | ||
RS | 27.06.2024 | ||
GR | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 27.03.2024 | |
NO | 27.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2016127166 (PANASONIC IP MAN CORP); | [Y]JP2017212430 (MICRONICS JAPAN CO LTD); | [A]JP2018022719 (MICRONICS JAPAN CO LTD) | International search | [A]JP2016127166 (PANASONIC IP MAN CORP); | [YA]JP2017059516 (PANASONIC IP MAN CORP); | [Y]JP2017212430 (MICRONICS JAPAN CO LTD); | [Y]JP2018022719 (MICRONICS JAPAN CO LTD); | [A]JP2018152532 (MICRONICS JAPAN CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2016082125 | JP2016091931 | JP20180212875 |