EP3882234 - COBALT COMPLEX, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING COBALT-CONTAINING THIN FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tosoh Corporation 4560, Kaisei-cho Shunan-shi Yamaguchi 746-8501 / JP | For all designated states Sagami Chemical Research Institute 2743-1, Hayakawa Ayase-shi Kanagawa 252-1193 / JP | [2021/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OIKE, Hiroyuki c/o Tosoh Corporation, Tokyo Research Center, 2743-1, Hayakawa Ayase-shi, Kanagawa 252-1123 / JP | 02 /
HAYAKAWA, Teppei c/o Tosoh Corporation, Tokyo Research Center, 2743-1, Hayakawa Ayase-shi, Kanagawa 252-1123 / JP | 03 /
YAMAMOTO, Yuki c/o Tosoh Corporation, Tokyo Research Center, 2743-1, Hayakawa Ayase-shi, Kanagawa 252-1123 / JP | 04 /
FURUKAWA, Taishi c/o Tosoh Corporation, Tokyo Research Center, 2743-1, Hayakawa Ayase-shi, Kanagawa 252-1123 / JP | 05 /
TADA, Ken-ichi c/o Sagami Chemical Research Institute, 2743-1, Hayakawa Ayase-shi, Kanagawa 252-1193 / JP | [2021/38] | Representative(s) | Vigand, Philippe, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex - Genève / CH | [2021/38] | Application number, filing date | 19884650.3 | 08.11.2019 | [2021/38] | WO2019JP43979 | Priority number, date | JP20180212049 | 12.11.2018 Original published format: JP 2018212049 | JP20190022221 | 12.02.2019 Original published format: JP 2019022221 | JP20190132379 | 18.07.2019 Original published format: JP 2019132379 | [2021/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020100765 | Date: | 22.05.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3882234 | Date: | 22.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3882234 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07C251/12, C07F15/06, C07F19/00, C07C49/12, C07F7/10, C23C16/18, C07C49/14, C23C16/448, C23C16/455 | [2022/35] | CPC: |
C07F15/065 (EP,IL,US);
C07F15/06 (IL,KR);
C07C49/12 (EP,IL);
C07C49/14 (EP,IL);
C07F17/02 (IL,KR);
C23C16/18 (EP,IL,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/38] | C07C251/12, C07F15/06, C07F19/00, C07C49/12, C07F7/10, C23C16/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOBALTKOMPLEX, VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES KOBALTHALTIGEN DÜNNFILMS | [2021/38] | English: | COBALT COMPLEX, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING COBALT-CONTAINING THIN FILM | [2021/38] | French: | COMPLEXE DE COBALT, SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN FILM MINCE CONTENANT DU COBALT | [2021/38] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2021 | Translation filed | 07.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 07.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/38] | 22.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2017081857 (UBE INDUSTRIES); | International search | [XA]JPH02169547 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND); | [XA]JPH0314534 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND); | [A]JP2007153869 (TOSOH CORP, et al); | [A]JP2009161513 (AIR PROD & CHEM); | [A]WO2012060428 (UBE INDUSTRIES [JP], et al); | [XA]JP2017081857 (UBE INDUSTRIES); | by applicant | WO2014052316 | JP2016222568 | JP2017081857 | JP2018507255 | JP2019022221 | JP2019132379 | JP20180212049 |