EP3880177 - ACTUATING COMPONENTS AND RELATED METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.09.2023 [2023/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Massachusetts Institute of Technology 77 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | For all designated states The Brigham and Women's Hospital, Inc. 75 Francis Street Boston, MA 02115 / US | [2021/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LANGER, Robert, S. 98 Montvale Road Newton, MA 02459 / US | 02 /
TRAVERSO, Carlo, Giovanni 1013 Beacon Street Unit 1 Newton, MA 02459 / US | 03 /
MINAHAN, Daniel 184 Mount Vernon Road East Weymouth, MA 02189 / US | 04 /
ABRAMSON, Alex, G. 568 Conway Village Drive St. Louis, MO 63141 / US | 05 /
CAFFAREL SALVADOR, Ester 881 Massachusetts Avenue Apt. 73 Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 06 /
SOARES, Vance 115 Webster Street Boston, MA 02128 / US | [2021/38] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/38] | Application number, filing date | 19884677.6 | 17.05.2019 | [2021/38] | WO2019US32817 | Priority number, date | US201862767710P | 15.11.2018 Original published format: US 201862767710 P | [2021/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020101737 | Date: | 22.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3880177 | Date: | 22.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61M31/00, A61J3/07, A61M37/00, A61K9/00, A61K38/00, A61K9/48, B33Y80/00, // A61B5/145, A61B5/00, A61M5/32 | [2022/41] | CPC: |
B33Y80/00 (EP);
A61M37/0015 (EP,US);
A61M31/00 (EP,US);
A61M2037/0023 (EP,US);
A61M2037/0046 (EP,US);
A61M2205/0244 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/38] | A61K9/00, A61M5/00, A61M31/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/38] | Title | German: | BETÄTIGUNGSKOMPONENTEN UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VERFAHREN | [2021/38] | English: | ACTUATING COMPONENTS AND RELATED METHODS | [2021/38] | French: | COMPOSANTS D'ACTIONNEMENT ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2021/38] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 07.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/38] | 05.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/38] | 04.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 15.06.2021 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   17.06.2021 | 31.05.2023 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0344939 (PFIZER [US]) [X] 3,8,13,14 * page 2, paragraph 1 - page 13, paragraph 38; figure 1 *[I] 15; | [XI]US2011207998 (KATAYAMA MIHO [JP]) [X] 1-8,11-15 * page 1, paragraph 3 - page 4, paragraph 55; figures 1-15B * [I] 9; | [X]US2013164373 (IMRAN MIR [US]) [X] 1-15 * page 1, paragraph 3 - page 20, paragraph 138; figures 1a-20I *; | [X]US2015064241 (CONRAD ANDREW JASON [US]) [X] 1-15 * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 16, paragraph 136; figures 1-19 *; | [X]WO2016155671 (FU JUNZHI [CN]) [X] 1-15 * page 1, paragraph 2 - page 27, paragraph 114; figures 1-12 * | International search | [A]US2013165772 (TRAVERSO CARLO GIOVANNI [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * entire document *; | [A]US2017319834 (JOHNSON DAVID MATHEW [US], et al) [A] 1-7* entire document *; | [X]US2018169003 (IMRAN MIR [US]) [X] 1-7 * entire document * |