Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022002864 | Global Dossier | 06.01.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018215791 | 16.11.2018 | WO2019JP41870 | 25.10.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113015583B | Global Dossier | 11.08.2023 | B | CN113015583 | 22.06.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2018215791 | 16.11.2018 | WO2019JP41870 | 25.10.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3854492 | Global Dossier | 19.06.2024 | B1 | EP3854492 | 26.01.2022 | A4 | EP3854492 | 28.07.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018215791 | 16.11.2018 | WO2019JP41870 | 25.10.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020100554 | Global Dossier | 22.05.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018215791 | 16.11.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6852040B | Global Dossier | 31.03.2021 | B2 | JP2020088016 | 04.06.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2018215791 | 16.11.2018 |