EP3881310 - APPLICATION MANAGEMENT FOR MULTI-FORM FACTOR INFORMATION HANDLING SYSTEM (IHS) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.08.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dell Products L.P. One Dell Way Round Rock, TX 78682-2244 / US | [2021/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEIBERT, Philip M. 4802 Avenue H Austin, Texas 78751 / US | 02 /
IYER, Vivek Viswanathan 12609 Evening Star Pass Austin, Texas 78732 / US | [2021/38] | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2021/38] | Application number, filing date | 19885024.0 | 12.11.2019 | [2021/38] | WO2019US60868 | Priority number, date | US201816191790 | 15.11.2018 Original published format: US201816191790 | [2021/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020102161 | Date: | 22.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3881310 | Date: | 22.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/16, G06F3/04886 | [2022/32] | CPC: |
G06F3/147 (EP);
G06F1/1669 (EP,US);
G06F1/1618 (US);
G06F1/1647 (EP,US);
G06F1/1677 (EP);
G06F1/1681 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/38] | G09G5/00, G06F1/26, G06F3/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/38] | Title | German: | ANWENDUNGSVERWALTUNG FÜR MEHRFORMFAKTOR-INFORMATIONSHANDHABUNGSSYSTEM (IHS) | [2021/38] | English: | APPLICATION MANAGEMENT FOR MULTI-FORM FACTOR INFORMATION HANDLING SYSTEM (IHS) | [2021/38] | French: | GESTION D'APPLICATION POUR SYSTÈME DE GESTION D'INFORMATIONS DE FACTEUR MULTI-FORME (IHS) | [2021/38] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 04.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/38] | 06.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2018210508 (AURONGZEB DEEDER M [US], et al) [X] 1-15* the whole document * | International search | [A]US2003151562 (KULAS CHARLES J [US]) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [YA]US2003235452 (KRAUS MARK GERARD [US], et al) [Y] 1, 6, 8-11 * entire document * [A] 17-20; | [A]US2005280640 (BONORDEN DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [YA]US2010245256 (ESTRADA JULIO [US], et al) [Y] 1, 6, 8-11 * entire document * [A] 17-20; | [YA]US2012081400 (SCHROCK RODNEY WAYNE [US], et al) [Y] 8-11 * entire document * [A] 17-20; | [A]US2012303984 (STEDMAN ROY W [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A] - Yin Yafeng et al, "CamK: A camera-based keyboard for small mobile devices", IEEE INFOCOM 2016-The 35th Annual IEEE International Conference on Computer Communications, (20160414), doi:10.1109/INFOCOM.2016.7524400, pages 1 - 9, XP032929992 [A] 1-20 * entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/INFOCOM.2016.7524400 | by applicant | US2018210508 |