Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
27.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
13.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
29.11.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
16.07.2022 | Supplementary search report | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] |
15.07.2022 | Change - representative | |
15.07.2022 | Change - classification | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] |
15.07.2022 | Change - classification | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] |
21.01.2022 | Change: Validation states | published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] |
21.01.2022 | Change - extension states | published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] |
07.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant | |
01.12.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
20.08.2021 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 22.09.2021 [2021/38] |
20.08.2021 | Request for examination filed | published on 22.09.2021 [2021/38] |
27.07.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
19.05.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
01.05.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
19.04.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
17.04.2021 | Change - representative | |
17.04.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
21.08.2020 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
22.05.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
22.05.2020 | New entry: applicant or inventor |