Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021269791 | Global Dossier | 02.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202117320987 | 14.05.2021 | US201862768485 | 16.11.2018 | WO2019US61439 | 14.11.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20210092767 | Global Dossier | 26.07.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201862768485 | 16.11.2018 | WO2019US61439 | 14.11.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2022513599 | Global Dossier | 09.02.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201862768485 | 16.11.2018 | WO2019US61439 | 14.11.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL282681 | Global Dossier | 30.06.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201862768485 | 16.11.2018 | WO2019US61439 | 14.11.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN112969781 | Global Dossier | 15.06.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201862768485 | 16.11.2018 | WO2019US61439 | 14.11.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3120185 | Global Dossier | 22.05.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862768485 | 16.11.2018 | WO2019US61439 | 14.11.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2019378003 | Global Dossier | 20.05.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862768485 | 16.11.2018 | WO2019US61439 | 14.11.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3880241 | Global Dossier | 17.08.2022 | A4 | EP3880241 | 22.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862768485 | 16.11.2018 | WO2019US61439 | 14.11.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112021007471 | 10.08.2021 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201862768485 | 16.11.2018 | WO2019US61439 | 14.11.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020102507 | Global Dossier | 16.07.2020 | A8 | WO2020102507 | 22.05.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862768485 | 16.11.2018 |