Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
22.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
01.03.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
01.03.2024 | First examination report | |
01.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
03.11.2023 | Change - applicant | published on 06.12.2023 [2023/49] |
03.11.2023 | Change - inventor | published on 06.12.2023 [2023/49] |
25.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
21.07.2023 | Resumption | published on 23.08.2023 [2023/34] |
03.02.2023 | Interruption | published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] |
16.09.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
14.07.2022 | Supplementary search report | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
08.07.2022 | Change - classification | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
08.07.2022 | Change - classification | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
21.01.2022 | Change: Validation states | published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] |
21.01.2022 | Change - extension states | published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] |
20.08.2021 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 22.09.2021 [2021/38] |
20.08.2021 | Request for examination filed | published on 22.09.2021 [2021/38] |
28.07.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
18.06.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
31.05.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
29.05.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
29.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant | |
26.05.2021 | Change - representative | |
26.05.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
22.05.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
22.05.2020 | New entry: applicant or inventor |