Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3880258 | Global Dossier | 10.08.2022 | A4 | EP3880258 | 22.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US52013 | 19.09.2019 | US201816194314 | 17.11.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020101802 | Global Dossier | 22.05.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201816194314 | 17.11.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10343933 | Global Dossier | 09.07.2019 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US201816194314 | 17.11.2018 |