EP3876466 - BEAM REPORTING METHOD AND COMMUNICATION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHI, Hongzhe Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
GE, Shibin Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
BI, Xiaoyan Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/36] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2021/36] | Application number, filing date | 19886710.3 | 18.11.2019 | [2021/36] | WO2019CN119186 | Priority number, date | CN201811378725 | 19.11.2018 Original published format: CN201811378725 | [2021/36] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020103793 | Date: | 28.05.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3876466 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 28.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/06, H04B7/08, H04L5/00 | [2021/46] | CPC: |
H04L5/0048 (EP,CN,US);
H04W72/046 (CN,US);
H04W24/10 (US);
H04B7/024 (EP);
H04B7/063 (EP);
H04B7/0695 (EP);
H04B7/088 (EP);
H04L5/0023 (EP);
H04L5/0053 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/36] | H04L5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/36] | Title | German: | STRAHLMELDUNGSVERFAHREN UND KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2021/36] | English: | BEAM REPORTING METHOD AND COMMUNICATION APPARATUS | [2021/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RAPPORT DE FAISCEAUX ET APPAREIL DE COMMUNICATION | [2021/36] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2021 | Translation filed | 31.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 31.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/36] | 11.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN108111278 (ZTE CORP) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0137] - paragraph [0166] * * paragraph [0216] - paragraph [0248] * * figures 1-4, 7, 8 *; | [XI]US2018227031 (GUO LI [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-11,13-15 * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0069] * * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0084] * * paragraph [0139] * * paragraph [0189] - paragraph [0191] * * paragraph [0216] - paragraph [0220] * * claim 1 * * figures 10, 12, 15-23, 28 * [I] 6,12; | [P]EP3512150 (ZTE CORP [CN]) |