EP3883934 - THERAPEUTIC DENDRIMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.08.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Starpharma Pty Limited 4/6 Southampton Crescent Abbotsford VIC 3067 / AU | [2021/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OWEN, David James c/o 4-6 Southampton Crescent Abbotsford, Victoria 3067 / AU | 02 /
KELLY, Brian Devlin c/o 4-6 Southampton Crescent Abbotsford, Victoria 3067 / AU | 03 /
DIETINGER, Christine Elisabet c/o 4-6 Southampton Crescent Abbotsford, Victoria 3067 / AU | [2021/39] | Representative(s) | Roukounas, Dimitrios c/o Regus Business Center Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/39] | Roukounas, Dimitrios Dietlindenstraße 18 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19886880.4 | 20.11.2019 | [2021/39] | WO2019AU51274 | Priority number, date | AU20180904431 | 20.11.2018 Original published format: AU 2018904431 | AU20190901708 | 20.05.2019 Original published format: AU 2019901708 | AU20190903358 | 10.09.2019 Original published format: AU 2019903358 | [2021/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020102852 | Date: | 28.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3883934 | Date: | 29.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 28.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/64, A61K47/60, A61P35/00, C07D491/22, // A61K39/395, A61K31/4745 | [2023/02] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP,AU,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/4745 (EP,AU,IL,KR,US);
C07D491/22 (EP,AU,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/502 (EP,AU,IL,KR,US);
A61K39/3955 (EP,AU,IL,US);
A61K45/06 (KR);
A61K47/595 (IL,KR,US);
A61K47/60 (EP,KR);
A61K47/641 (AU);
A61K47/645 (EP);
C07K16/2803 (AU);
C07K16/2818 (EP,IL,KR);
C07K16/2827 (AU);
C07K16/2863 (EP,AU,IL,KR);
A61K2039/505 (EP,AU,IL,KR);
A61K2300/00 (AU,IL,KR)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/4745, A61K2300/00 (AU,EP);
A61K31/502, A61K2300/00 (AU,EP);
A61K39/3955, A61K2300/00 (AU,EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/39] | C07D491/22, C07K16/28, A61K31/4745, A61K31/502, A61K39/395, A61K47/64, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/39] | Title | German: | THERAPEUTISCHES DENDRIMER | [2021/39] | English: | THERAPEUTIC DENDRIMER | [2021/39] | French: | DENDRIMÈRE THÉRAPEUTIQUE | [2021/39] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 18.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/39] | 12.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2008034120 (ENZON PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al); | [Y]US2018326081 (OWEN DAVID [AU], et al); | [E]WO2020107078 (STARPHARMA PTY LTD [AU]); | International search | [X]WO2008034120 (ENZON PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al); | [X]WO2012167309 (STARPHARMA PTY LTD [AU], et al); | [X]US2018326081 (OWEN DAVID [AU], et al) |