Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
13.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
21.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
25.11.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
22.07.2022 | Supplementary search report | published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] |
22.07.2022 | Change - classification | published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] |
22.07.2022 | Change - classification | published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] |
21.01.2022 | Change: Validation states | published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] |
21.01.2022 | Change - extension states | published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] |
15.11.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
27.08.2021 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 29.09.2021 [2021/39] |
27.08.2021 | Request for examination filed | published on 29.09.2021 [2021/39] |
02.08.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
15.07.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
25.06.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
16.06.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
15.06.2021 | Change - representative | |
15.06.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
30.05.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
30.05.2020 | New entry: applicant or inventor |