Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11926765 | Global Dossier | 12.03.2024 | B2 | US2022010178 | 13.01.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018216788 | 19.11.2018 | JP2019098889 | 27.05.2019 | WO2019JP45082 | 18.11.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102669588B | Global Dossier | 29.05.2024 | B1 | KR20210094581 | 29.07.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2018216788 | 19.11.2018 | JP2019098889 | 27.05.2019 | WO2019JP45082 | 18.11.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPWO2020105586 | Global Dossier | 07.10.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018216788 | 19.11.2018 | JP2019098889 | 27.05.2019 | WO2019JP45082 | 18.11.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113165343 | Global Dossier | 23.07.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2018216788 | 19.11.2018 | JP2019098889 | 27.05.2019 | WO2019JP45082 | 18.11.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3885136 | Global Dossier | 24.08.2022 | A4 | EP3885136 | 29.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018216788 | 19.11.2018 | JP2019098889 | 27.05.2019 | WO2019JP45082 | 18.11.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG11202105236V | 29.06.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2018216788 | 19.11.2018 | JP2019098889 | 27.05.2019 | WO2019JP45082 | 18.11.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020105586 | Global Dossier | 28.05.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018216788 | 19.11.2018 | JP2019098889 | 27.05.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI833840B | 01.03.2024 | B | TW202028406 | 01.08.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2018216788 | 19.11.2018 | JP2019098889 | 27.05.2019 |