EP3888074 - DUAL LABEL COMBINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Iconex LLC 3237 Satellite Blvd, Suite 550 Duluth, GA 30096 / US | [2021/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRANCOEUR, Roger 8703 N160th Court Bennington, Nebraska 68007 / US | 02 /
LIVINGSTON, Timothy Darren 8350 Cliff Ridge Ct. Corryton, Tennessee 37721 / US | [2021/40] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/40] | Schwegman Lundberg Woessner Limited Hillington Park Innovation Centre 1 Ainslie Road Glasgow G52 4RU / GB | Application number, filing date | 19889855.3 | 27.11.2019 | [2021/40] | WO2019US63771 | Priority number, date | US201816203084 | 28.11.2018 Original published format: US201816203084 | [2021/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020113117 | Date: | 04.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3888074 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G09F3/02, B41M5/42, G09F3/08, G09F3/10 | [2021/40] | CPC: |
G09F3/0288 (EP);
G09F3/10 (EP);
G09F2003/0211 (EP);
G09F2003/022 (EP);
G09F2003/0222 (EP);
G09F2003/025 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/40] | Title | German: | KOMBINATION AUS ZWEI ETIKETTEN | [2021/40] | English: | DUAL LABEL COMBINATION | [2021/40] | French: | COMBINAISON DE DEUX ÉTIQUETTES | [2021/40] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 28.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/40] | 17.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5449201 (MILLER FRANK D [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6 * column 4, line 6 - column 6, line 52 * * figures 1-4 * [Y] 4,5,7-15; | [I]US5958536 (GELSINGER TIMOTHY L [US], et al) [I] 1,9,14 * column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 57 ** figures 1-4 *; | [I]US2012234481 (RAMING BRUCE [US]) [I] 1-3,9,10,12-15 * paragraphs [0041] - [0045] - [0054] , [0058] * * figures 1-25 *; | [Y]US8568847 (BROOKSHIRE JODY [US], et al) [Y] 4,5,7-15 * column 1, line 61 - column 4, line 62 * * figures 1-7 * | International search | [A]US5449201 (MILLER FRANK D [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US5580640 (KRAFT ROGER E [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US6254138 (RAWLINGS TIMOTHY W [US], et al) [A] 1-20* entire document *; | [A]US2004195824 (BLANK PAUL C [US]) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US2009110865 (MCKILLIP JOHN J [US]) [A] 1-20 * entire document * | by applicant | US5449201 | US5958536 | US2012234481 | US8568847 |