EP3887705 - FLUID MANIFOLD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saint-Gobain Performance Plastics Corporation 31500 Solon Road Solon, OH 44139 / US | [2021/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUSCHKE, Michael R. 4612 Lund Dr. Midland, Michigan 48642 / US | [2021/40] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2021/40] | Application number, filing date | 19890115.9 | 25.11.2019 | [2021/40] | WO2019US63027 | Priority number, date | US201862771959P | 27.11.2018 Original published format: US 201862771959 P | [2021/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020112646 | Date: | 04.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3887705 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3887705 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F16L41/03, F15D1/14 | [2022/28] | CPC: |
F16L41/03 (EP,KR,US);
F15D1/14 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/40] | F16L41/03 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKEITSVERTEILER | [2021/40] | English: | FLUID MANIFOLD | [2021/40] | French: | COLLECTEUR DE FLUIDE | [2021/40] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 28.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/40] | 28.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US1850937 (MESSINGER GEORGE S) [X] 1,2,6-11,14,15 * figure 1 *[A] 3-5,12,13; | [XA]US4717289 (POPOWICH STANLEY [CA], et al) [X] 1-11,14,15 * figure 1 * [A] 12,13; | [XA]US2016157419 (HENRY JAMES W [CA], et al) [X] 1-11,14,15 * figure 1 * [A] 12,13 | International search | [YX]JPH09100984 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) [Y] 4-5,12-13 [X] 1-3,6-11,14-15; | [A]JP2002030929 (AISIN TAKAOKA LTD) [A] 1-15; | [A]KR20020090998 (JANG JOON SOO [KR]) [A] 1-15; | [A]US2009183502 (LEROY VINCENT [FR])[A] 1-15; | [Y]JP2013213522 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [Y] 4-5,12-13 | Examination | DE8900751U | by applicant | US1850937 | US4717289 | US2016157419 |