EP3868715 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING CATHODE ACTIVE MATERIAL PRECURSOR FOR LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.07.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2021/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HWANG, Cho Hee LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Seong Bae LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
PARK, Kyoung Wan LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Eun Hee LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2021/34] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/34] | Application number, filing date | 19890277.7 | 21.11.2019 | [2021/34] | WO2019KR16014 | Priority number, date | KR20180152270 | 30.11.2018 Original published format: KR 20180152270 | [2021/34] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020111655 | Date: | 04.06.2020 | Language: | KO | [2020/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3868715 | Date: | 25.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C01G53/00, H01M4/525, H01M4/505, H01M10/052, H01M4/02 | [2021/34] | CPC: |
C01G53/50 (EP);
C01G53/006 (KR);
H01M4/0416 (US);
H01M10/052 (KR);
H01M10/0525 (EP,US);
H01M4/505 (KR,US);
H01M4/525 (EP,KR,US);
C01P2004/03 (EP);
C01P2004/51 (EP);
C01P2004/53 (KR);
C01P2004/61 (EP,KR);
C01P2006/11 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/34] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES KATHODENAKTIVMATERIALS FÜR EINE LITHIUMSEKUNDÄRBATTERIE | [2021/34] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING CATHODE ACTIVE MATERIAL PRECURSOR FOR LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY | [2021/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN PRÉCURSEUR DE MATÉRIAU ACTIF DE CATHODE DESTINÉ À UNE BATTERIE RECHARGEABLE AU LITHIUM | [2021/34] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2021 | Translation filed | 18.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 18.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/34] | 30.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2014149766 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [X] 10,12-14 * paragraph [0065]; example - * [I] 13; | [Y]KR101748999B (ENERGY MAT TECH CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-14 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraphs [0055] , [0059] ** paragraphs [0094] , [0099]; example - *; | [Y]KR101815779B (ENERGY MATERIAL TECH CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-14 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0048]; examples 1,2,4; table - * | International search | [A]JP2011116583 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO)[A] 1-14; | [Y]KR20130009739 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO [JP]) [Y] 1-14; | [A]JP2015227263 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO) [A] 1-14; | [Y]KR20160099876 (E&D CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 8-14; | [Y]KR20180098735 (E&D CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-14 |