EP3886863 - ANTIVIRAL PRODRUGS AND NANOFORMULATIONS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.09.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Board of Regents of the University of Nebraska Varner Hall 3835 Holdrege Street Lincoln, NE 68583 / US | [2021/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GENDELMAN, Howard, E. 125 S. 127th Plaza Omaha, NE 68154 / US | 02 /
EDAGWA, Benson 310 N. 40th Street, Apt. 9 Omaha, NE 68131 / US | [2021/40] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/40] | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 19891191.9 | 27.11.2019 | [2021/40] | WO2019US63498 | Priority number, date | US201862772852P | 29.11.2018 Original published format: US 201862772852 P | [2021/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020112931 | Date: | 04.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3886863 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/675, C07D413/14 | [2021/40] | CPC: |
C07D519/00 (EP);
A61K47/55 (EP,US);
A61K9/146 (EP,US);
A61P31/18 (EP,US);
C07D215/56 (EP);
C07D413/14 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/40] | Title | German: | ANTIVIRALE PRODRUGS UND NANOFORMULIERUNGEN DAVON | [2021/40] | English: | ANTIVIRAL PRODRUGS AND NANOFORMULATIONS THEREOF | [2021/40] | French: | PROMÉDICAMENTS ANTIVIRAUX ET NANOFORMULATIONS DE CEUX-CI | [2021/40] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 22.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2021 | Observations by third parties | 22.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/40] | 29.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2017223280 (VIIV HEALTHCARE CO [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * schemes;; example -; claim - *; | [Y] - ZHOU TIAN ET AL, "Creation of a nanoformulated cabotegravir prodrug with improved antiretroviral profiles", BIOMATERIALS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20171015), vol. 151, doi:10.1016/J.BIOMATERIALS.2017.10.023, ISSN 0142-9612, pages 53 - 65, XP085235415 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biomaterials.2017.10.023 | [Y] - BRADY SILLMAN ET AL, "Creation of a long-acting nanoformulated dolutegravir", NATURE COMMUNICATIONS, (20180206), vol. 9, no. 1, doi:10.1038/s41467-018-02885-x, XP055666371 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s41467-018-02885-x | [Y] - NAMANJA HILDA A. ET AL, "Toward Eradicating HIV Reservoirs in the Brain: Inhibiting P-Glycoprotein at the Blood-Brain Barrier with Prodrug Abacavir Dimers", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (20110909), vol. 134, no. 6, doi:10.1021/ja206867t, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 2976 - 2980, XP055925238 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja206867t | International search | [A]US6124327 (SILVERMAN KEITH C [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 4/1-3, 5/4/1-3, 8-11* ; column 1, lines 61-67; column 2, lines 1-60; column 7, lines 10-13 *; | [A]US2011183940 (JOHNS BRIAN ALVIN [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 4/1-3, 5/4/1-3, 8-11 * ; paragraph [0004] *; | [A]US2015297587 (GELBARD HARRIS A [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 4/1-3, 5/4/1-3, 8-11 * ; paragraphs *; | [A]US2016184332 (RENNER JUERGEN [DE]) [A] 1-3, 4/1-3, 5/4/1-3, 8-11 * ; abstract *; | [A]US2018051043 (YU TAO [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 4/1-3, 5/4/1-3, 8-11 * ; paragraph [0025] *; | [A] - ZHOU, T et al., "Creation of a nanoformulated cabotegravir prodrug with improved antiretroviral profiles", Biomaterials, (20180100), vol. 151, doi:10.1016/j.biomaterials.2017.10.023, pages 53 - 65, XP085235415 [A] 1-3, 4/1-3, 5/4/1-3, 8-11 * ; abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biomaterials.2017.10.023 |