Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
06.09.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
06.09.2024 | First examination report | |
15.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
25.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
16.12.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
29.06.2022 | Supplementary search report | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
24.06.2022 | Change - classification | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
24.06.2022 | Change - classification | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
11.02.2022 | Change: Validation states | published on 16.03.2022 [2022/11] |
11.02.2022 | Change - extension states | published on 16.03.2022 [2022/11] |
13.12.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
10.09.2021 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 13.10.2021 [2021/41] |
10.09.2021 | Request for examination filed | published on 13.10.2021 [2021/41] |
16.08.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
04.08.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
15.07.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
01.07.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
01.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant | |
30.06.2021 | Change - representative | |
30.06.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
13.06.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
13.06.2020 | New entry: applicant or inventor |