Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022017513 | Global Dossier | 20.01.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019CN123485 | 06.12.2019 | CN201811489503 | 06.12.2018 | CN201911161764 | 22.11.2019 | CN201811572313 | 21.12.2018 | CN201910403277 | 15.05.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7464920B | Global Dossier | 10.04.2024 | B2 | JP2022511130 | 28.01.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019CN123485 | 06.12.2019 | CN201811489503 | 06.12.2018 | CN201911161764 | 22.11.2019 | CN201811572313 | 21.12.2018 | CN201910403277 | 15.05.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113185446 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201811489503 | 06.12.2018 | CN201911161764 | 22.11.2019 | CN201811572313 | 21.12.2018 | CN201980011541 | 06.12.2019 | CN201910403277 | 15.05.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111712484B | Global Dossier | 28.05.2021 | B | CN111712484 | 25.09.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019CN123485 | 06.12.2019 | CN201811489503 | 06.12.2018 | CN201911161764 | 22.11.2019 | CN201811572313 | 21.12.2018 | CN201910403277 | 15.05.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3892616 | Global Dossier | 27.07.2022 | A4 | EP3892616 | 13.10.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019CN123485 | 06.12.2019 | CN201811489503 | 06.12.2018 | CN201911161764 | 22.11.2019 | CN201811572313 | 21.12.2018 | CN201910403277 | 15.05.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020114475 | Global Dossier | 11.06.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201811489503 | 06.12.2018 | CN201911161764 | 22.11.2019 | CN201811572313 | 21.12.2018 | CN201910403277 | 15.05.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW202033500 | 16.09.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201811489503 | 06.12.2018 | CN201911161764 | 22.11.2019 | CN201811572313 | 21.12.2018 | CN201910403277 | 15.05.2019 |