EP3891863 - ADAPTIVE WIRELESS POWER TRANSMITTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.09.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Powermat Technologies Ltd. 94 Em Hamoshavot Road Bldg. Alon B POB 3246 4970602 Kiryat Arie, Petach Tikva / IL | [2021/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHERMAN, Itay 44 Havazelet St. 4501560 Hod HaSharon / IL | [2021/41] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/41] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19892448.2 | 03.12.2019 | [2021/41] | WO2019IB60415 | Priority number, date | US201862774904P | 04.12.2018 Original published format: US 201862774904 P | [2021/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020115665 | Date: | 11.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3891863 | Date: | 13.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 11.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02J50/10, H02J50/50 | [2021/41] | CPC: |
H02J50/402 (EP,US);
H02J50/10 (EP,US);
H02J50/90 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/41] | Title | German: | ADAPTIVER DRAHTLOSER STROMSENDER | [2021/41] | English: | ADAPTIVE WIRELESS POWER TRANSMITTER | [2021/41] | French: | ÉMETTEUR DE PUISSANCE SANS FIL ADAPTATIF | [2021/41] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 02.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/41] | 21.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2015318730 (BHARGAVA KUNAL [NZ], et al) [Y] 5-10* paragraphs [0040], [0056];; claims 33, 34 *; | [XYI]US9438067 (NA GI-YONG [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,14,15 * column 3, lines 9 - 17; column 8, line 55 - column 9, line 9; column 6, lines 24 - 31;; figures 2, 11 * [Y] 5-10 [I] 3,4,11-13,16-18 | International search | [XYA]US2016226292 (YOON SEUNGHWAN [US]) [X] 1-4, 6-10, 12-16, 18 * Entire Document Entire Document Entire Document * [Y] 17 [A] 5, 11; | [YA]US2018090954 (GRAHAM CHRISTOPHER S [US], et al) [Y] 17 * Entire Document Entire Document * [A] 1-16, 18; | [A]EP3373413 (POWERMAT TECH LTD [IL]) [A] 1-18 * Entire Document *; | [A]US10135297 (WAKABAYASHI NAOYUKI [JP]) [A] 1-18 * Entire Document *; | [PA]WO2019150379 (POWERMAT TECH LTD [IL]) [PA] 1-18* Entire Document *; | [PA]CN110112839 (UNIV NORTHWESTERN POLYTECHNICAL) [PA] 1-18 * Entire Document *; | [PA]WO2019229750 (POWERMAT TECH LTD [IL]) [PA] 1-18 * Entire Document * | by applicant | US2015318730 | US9438067 |