EP3892023 - SINGLE SIGN-ON USING SMART CREDENTIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Entrust Corporation 1187 Park Place Shakopee, MN 55379 / US | [2023/46] |
Former [2021/41] | For all designated states Entrust, Inc. 5420 LBJ Freeway Suite 300 Dallas TX 75240 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MALLINSON, Michael c/o Entrust, Inc. Two Lincoln Centre 5420 LBJ Freeway, Suite 300 Dallas, TX 75240 / US | 02 /
REILLY, Ian c/o Entrust, Inc. Two Lincoln Centre 5420 LBJ Freeway, Suite 300 Dallas, TX 75240 / US | 03 /
JAYAPRAKASH, Rathnavalli c/o Entrust, Inc. Two Lincoln Centre 5420 LBJ Freeway, Suite 300 Dallas, TX 75240 / US | 04 /
LYNESS, Martin c/o Entrust, Inc. Two Lincoln Centre 5420 LBJ Freeway, Suite 300 Dallas, TX 75240 / US | 05 /
GERLACH, Tim c/o Entrust, Inc. Two Lincoln Centre 5420 LBJ Freeway, Suite 300 Dallas, TX 75240 / US | [2021/41] | Representative(s) | Brunazzi, Stefano, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | [2021/41] | Application number, filing date | 19893033.1 | 06.12.2019 | [2021/41] | WO2019US64892 | Priority number, date | US201862776337P | 06.12.2018 Original published format: US 201862776337 P | [2021/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020118161 | Date: | 11.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3892023 | Date: | 13.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3892023 | Date: | 21.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 11.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W12/069, H04L9/40, H04W4/80, H04L9/32, H04L9/08, H04L9/00 | [2022/35] | CPC: |
H04L9/3271 (EP,US);
H04L63/0815 (EP,US);
H04L63/0823 (EP,US);
H04L63/0853 (EP,US);
H04L63/0869 (EP);
H04L9/006 (EP);
H04L9/0897 (EP);
H04L9/3226 (EP);
H04L9/3234 (EP);
H04L9/3247 (EP);
H04L9/3263 (US);
H04W12/068 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/41] | H04W12/06, H04W12/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINMALIGE ANMELDUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG VON INTELLIGENTEN ZUGANGSDATEN | [2021/41] | English: | SINGLE SIGN-ON USING SMART CREDENTIAL | [2021/41] | French: | AUTHENTIFICATION UNIQUE À L'AIDE D'UN JUSTIFICATIF D'IDENTITÉ INTELLIGENT | [2021/41] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 01.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/41] | 24.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0072506 (IBM [US], et al); | [Y]US2017171755 (GRANGE BENOIT [FR], et al); | [A]US2018183777 (GUILLORY THOMAS [FR], et al) | International search | [Y]US2003007641 (KINOSHITA KATSUHIRO [JP]); | [AY]US6886095 (HIND JOHN RAITHEL [US], et al); | [A]EP2200251 (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB]); | [A]KR20160028230 (HERIT CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]US2017324568 (ROTH GREGORY BRANCHEK [US], et al) | by applicant | WO0072506 | US2017171755 |