EP3841829 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING DATA VIA UWB IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.07.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/26] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Gyeonggi-do Suwon-si 16677 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Mingyu 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
JEONG, Seongah 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2021/26] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/26] | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 19893502.5 | 06.12.2019 | [2021/26] | WO2019KR17233 | Priority number, date | KR20180157482 | 07.12.2018 Original published format: KR 20180157482 | [2021/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020117012 | Date: | 11.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3841829 | Date: | 30.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 11.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/14, H04W76/40, H04W56/00, H04W4/70 | [2021/26] | CPC: |
G01S13/765 (EP,US);
H04W76/14 (KR);
G01S13/0209 (US);
G01S13/785 (US);
G01S5/0284 (US);
H04B1/7163 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/26] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SENDEN UND EMPFANGEN VON DATEN ÜBER UWB IN EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2021/26] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING DATA VIA UWB IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2021/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION ET DE RÉCEPTION DE DONNÉES PAR L'INTERMÉDIAIRE D'UNE BANDE ULTRALARGE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2021/26] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 23.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/26] | 25.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2010278060 (LEE CHEOLHYO [KR], et al) [I] 1,2,11,12,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0062] *; | [I] - BILLY VERSO, "Draft text covering two way ranging mechanisms, procedures and messages", (20181115), pages 1 - 24, IEEE DRAFT; 15-18-0599-00-004Z, IEEE-SA MENTOR, PISCATAWAY, NJ USA, URL: https://mentor.ieee.org/802.15/dcn/18/15-18-0599-00-004z-draft-text-covering-two-way-ranging-mechanisms-procedures-and-messages.docx, XP068133738 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - SEONGAH JEONG (SAMSUNG), "Inclusion of Multicast/Broadcast Ranging in Information Element", vol. 802.15 EIR; 802.15.4z, no. 1, (20181112), pages 1 - 16, IEEE DRAFT; 15-18-0550-01-004Z-INCLUSION-OF-MULTICAST-BROADCAST-RANGING-IN-INFORMATION-ELEMENT, IEEE-SA MENTOR, PISCATAWAY, NJ USA, URL: https://mentor.ieee.org/802.15/dcn/18/15-18-0550-01-004z-inclusion-of-multicast-broadcast-ranging-in-information-element.pptx, (20181112), XP068133677 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]KR20140008239 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR]) [A] 1-15; | [A]US2018213492 (XIA PEIQING [US]) [A] 1-15 | [YX] - Ayman Naguib (Apple), "MAC for secure ranging", IEEE Draft; 15-18-0540-00-004z-mac-for-secure-ranging,20181112IEEE-SA mentor, Piscataway, NJ USA, (20181111), vol. 802.15 EIR, pages 1 - 14, XP068133662 [Y] 5-9 [X] 1-4,10-15 | [Y] - Anonymous, "IEEE Standard for Wireless MediumAccess Control (MAC) and PhysicalLayer (PHY) Specifications for PeerAware Communications (PAC)`", IEEE Standards association, (20171206), pages 1 - 322, XP055712599 [Y] 5-9 | [A] - Seongah Jeong (Samsung), "Inclusion of multicast /broadcast ranging in information element", IEEE Draft; 15-18-0550-01-004z-inclusion-of-multicast-broadcast-ranging-in-information-element,20181112IEEE-SA mentor, Piscataway, NJ USA, (20181113), vol. 802.15 EIR, no. 1, pages 1 - 16, XP068133677 [A] 1-15 | by applicant | US2010278060 | - BILLY VERSO, "Draft text covering two way ranging mechanisms, procedures and messages", IEEE Draft, 15-18-0599-00-004Z |