Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20210089641 | Global Dossier | 16.07.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20180157482 | 07.12.2018 | WO2019KR17233 | 06.12.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3841829 | Global Dossier | 27.10.2021 | A4 | EP3841829 | 30.06.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20180157482 | 07.12.2018 | WO2019KR17233 | 06.12.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020117012 | Global Dossier | 11.06.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20180157482 | 07.12.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11262445 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2022 | B2 | US2020182996 | 11.06.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20180157482 | 07.12.2018 |