EP3780944 - IMPROVED TRAVELING SPRINKLER SYSTEMS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.12.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.01.2023 [2023/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Melnor, Inc. 109 Tyson Drive Winchester, VA 22603 / US | [2021/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANNER, Mark 109 Tyson Drive Winchester, VA 22603 / US | 02 /
MICHAEL, Vicky 109 Tyson Drive Winchester, VA 22603 / US | 03 /
CATALDO, John 109 Tyson Drive Winchester, VA 22603 / US | 04 /
MURRAY, Thomas 1024 Annin Street Philadelphia, PA 19147 / US | 05 /
MURRAY, Christopher 217 Carpenter Street Philadelphia, PA 19147 / US | 06 /
STACHOWSKI, Breanna 250 Hillside Drive Elma, NY 14059 / US | 07 /
ZERWECK, Jason 20 Soldier Song Lane Media, PA 19063 / US | [2021/08] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/08] | Application number, filing date | 19894215.3 | 04.12.2019 | [2021/08] | WO2019US64557 | Priority number, date | US201862775313P | 04.12.2018 Original published format: US 201862775313 P | [2021/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020117994 | Date: | 11.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3780944 | Date: | 24.02.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A01G25/09, B05B3/18, B05B3/06 | [2022/03] | CPC: |
A01G25/097 (EP,US);
B05B3/18 (EP,US);
B05B3/06 (EP,US);
F16H1/16 (US);
F16H3/24 (US)
|
Former IPC [2021/08] | A01G25/09, B05B3/00, B05B3/02, B05B3/04, B05B3/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/08] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE FAHRENDE SPRINKLERSYSTEME UND VERFAHREN | [2021/08] | English: | IMPROVED TRAVELING SPRINKLER SYSTEMS AND METHODS | [2021/08] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS D'ARROSEUR MOBILE AMÉLIORÉ | [2021/08] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 18.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/08] | 23.07.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/01] | 17.08.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2883116 (MUENCH CARL G) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [IDA]US3081038 (SPARKS WILLIAM B, et al) [ID] 1-8,10,15 * abstract * * column 2 - column 5 * [A] 9,11-14; | [A]US6604697 (HEREN LAWRENCE P [US], et al) [A] 1,11,15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004195407 (DUNCAN SCOTT W [US], et al) [A] 1,11,15* the whole document *; | [A]US7207503 (STENGEL TERRY J [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [AD]US2249211 (JOHNSON OSCAR G) [AD] 1-19* , entire document; *; | [AD]US2883116 (MUENCH CARL G) [AD] 1-19 * , entire document; *; | [A]US3085751 (WARRICK LEON H, et al) [A] 1-19 * , entire document; *; | [A]US3430859 (CHOW HO) [A] 1-19 * , entire document; *; | [A]US6604697 (HEREN LAWRENCE P [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * , entire document; *; | [A]US2004195407 (DUNCAN SCOTT W [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * , entire document; *; | [AD]US7207503 (STENGEL TERRY J [US], et al) [AD] 1-19 * , entire document; * |