EP3892612 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING ORGANIC TELLURIUM COMPOUND AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING VINYL POLYMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Otsuka Chemical Co., Ltd. 2-27, Otedori 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-0021 / JP | [2021/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAMOTO, Minoru c/o OTSUKA CHEMICAL CO., LTD., 463, Kagasuno, Kawauchi-cho Tokushima-shi, Tokushima 771-0193 / JP | [2021/41] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2021/41] | Application number, filing date | 19894322.7 | 19.11.2019 | [2021/41] | WO2019JP45167 | Priority number, date | JP20180228214 | 05.12.2018 Original published format: JP 2018228214 | [2021/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020116144 | Date: | 11.06.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3892612 | Date: | 13.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07C395/00, C08F4/42, C08F120/14 | [2022/39] | CPC: |
C07C395/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08F120/14 (EP);
C08F20/14 (US);
C08F4/42 (EP,KR,US);
C08F2438/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/41] | C07C395/00, C08F4/42 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/41] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ORGANISCHEN TELLURVERBINDUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON VINYLPOLYMEREN | [2021/41] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING ORGANIC TELLURIUM COMPOUND AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING VINYL POLYMER | [2021/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE COMPOSÉ DE TELLURE ORGANIQUE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE POLYMERE VINYLIQUE | [2021/41] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2021 | Translation filed | 20.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 20.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 20.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/41] | 03.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDA]WO2004014848 (OTSUKA KAGAKU KK [JP], et al) | International search | [X]WO2004014848 (OTSUKA KAGAKU KK [JP], et al) [X] 1-10; | [X]JP2004323437 (OTSUKA CHEMICAL CO LTD) [X] 8-10; | [X] - YAMAGO, S. et al., "Organotellurium compounds as novel initiators for controlled/living radical polymerizations . Synthesis of functionalized polystyrenes and end-group modifications", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (20020327), vol. 124, no. 12, pages 2874 - 2875, XP002964726 [X] 1-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja025554b | [X] - SILKS,L.A. et al., "Synthesis and 125-tellurium NMR spectroscopy of alpha- tellurocarbonyl compounds and derivatives", SYNTHETIC COMMUNICATIONS, (19910100), vol. 21, no. 8-9, doi:10.1080/00397919108019802, pages 1105 - 1119, XP002994690 [X] 1-7 * Table. 1, Scheme. 1, 1 1 1 2 - 1 1 1 8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/00397919108019802 | [A] - OHYANAGI TATSUYA et al., "Compact and stable SNAP ligand-conjugated quantum dots as a fluorescent probe for single-molecule imaging of dynein motor protein", Chemical Communications, (20151014), vol. 51, no. 80, pages 14836 - 14839, XP055716748 [A] 1-10 * supporting information * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/C5CC05526A | by applicant | WO2004014848 | JP2004323437 | WO2007119884 | JP2013119568 |