EP3888789 - HYDROCRACKING CATALYST, PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR AND APPLICATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.07.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.06.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Applicant(s) | For all designated states China Petroleum & Chemical Corporation 22 Chaoyangmen North Street Chaoyang District Beijing 100728 / CN | For all designated states Dalian Research Institute Of Petroleum And Petrochemicals, Sinopec Corp. No. 96, Nankai Street Lushunkou District Dalian, Liaoning Province 116045 / CN | [2021/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANG, Zhaoji No.96, Nankai Street, Lushunkou District Dalian, Liaoning 116045 / CN | 02 /
DU, Yanze No.96, Nankai Street, Lushunkou District Dalian, Liaoning 116045 / CN | 03 /
FAN, Hongfei No.96, Nankai Street, Lushunkou District Dalian, Liaoning 116045 / CN | 04 /
WANG, Jifeng No.96, Nankai Street, Lushunkou District Dalian, Liaoning 116045 / CN | 05 /
YU, Zhengmin No.96, Nankai Street, Lushunkou District Dalian, Liaoning 116045 / CN | 06 /
SUN, Xiaoyan No.96, Nankai Street, Lushunkou District Dalian, Liaoning 116045 / CN | [2021/40] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/40] | Application number, filing date | 19894747.5 | 12.12.2019 | [2021/40] | WO2019CN124803 | Priority number, date | CN201811521961 | 13.12.2018 Original published format: CN201811521961 | CN201811522285 | 13.12.2018 Original published format: CN201811522285 | [2021/40] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020119754 | Date: | 18.06.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3888789 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 18.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B01J29/16, B01J29/85, B01J21/08, C10G47/20, B01J29/80, B01J29/00 | [2022/04] | CPC: |
C10G47/20 (EP,KR,US);
B01J29/16 (KR);
B01J29/85 (EP,KR,US);
B01J21/08 (KR,US);
B01J29/005 (EP);
B01J29/14 (US);
B01J29/146 (US);
B01J29/166 (EP);
B01J35/19 (US);
B01J35/615 (US);
B01J35/617 (US);
B01J35/633 (US);
B01J35/635 (US);
B01J35/647 (US);
B01J37/0009 (US);
B01J37/0201 (US);
B01J37/0203 (US);
B01J37/0205 (US);
B01J6/001 (US);
C10G47/10 (US);
C10G47/16 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/40] | B01J29/16, B01J29/85, B01J21/08, C10G47/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/40] | Title | German: | HYDROCRACKING-KATALYSATOR, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND ANWENDUNG DAVON | [2021/40] | English: | HYDROCRACKING CATALYST, PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR AND APPLICATION THEREOF | [2021/40] | French: | CATALYSEUR D'HYDROCRAQUAGE, SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION ET SON APPLICATION | [2021/40] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2021 | Translation filed | 30.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 30.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/40] | 04.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 09.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.09.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8603694 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]); |