EP3875864 - WIRELESS COMMUNICATION MODULE AND AIR CONDITIONER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GD Midea Air-Conditioning Equipment Co., Ltd. No. 22 Lingang Road Beijiao Shunde Foshan, Guangdong 528311 / CN | For all designated states Midea Group Co., Ltd. B26-28F, Midea Headquarter Building No. 6 Midea Avenue Beijiao Shunde Foshan, Guangdong 528311 / CN | [2021/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KONG, Shumiao No. 22 Lingang Road, Beijiao, Shunde Foshan, Guangdong 528311 / CN | [2021/36] | Representative(s) | Whitlock, Holly Elizabeth Ann Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/36] | Lam, Alvin Maucher Jenkins 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 19894985.1 | 28.10.2019 | [2021/36] | WO2019CN113662 | Priority number, date | CN201811512972 | 11.12.2018 Original published format: CN201811512972 | CN20182277548U | 11.12.2018 Original published format: CN 201822077548 U | [2021/36] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020119288 | Date: | 18.06.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3875864 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 18.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F24F11/58 | [2021/36] | CPC: |
F24F11/88 (EP);
F24F11/56 (US);
F24F11/89 (EP);
G08C17/02 (US);
H03B5/32 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/36] | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSMODUL UND KLIMAANLAGE | [2021/36] | English: | WIRELESS COMMUNICATION MODULE AND AIR CONDITIONER | [2021/36] | French: | MODULE DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL ET CLIMATISEUR | [2021/36] | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2021 | Translation filed | 04.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 04.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/36] | 27.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US6175530 (THERON CONRAD A [US], et al) [I] 1-10 * column 3, line 44 - column 14, line 4; figures 3-11 *; | [I]CN101806487 (JIANGSU LANSWON SYSTEM INTEGRATION CO LTD) [I] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]CN107504645 (GUANGDONG MIDEA REFRIGERATION EQUIPMENT CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [I]US2018151004 (GINTZ BRAD [KY], et al) [I] 1-10 * paragraph [0180] - paragraph [0192]; figure 21 * * paragraph [0349] - paragraph [0362]; figure 28 *; | [A]US2018212792 (BRANDT ANDERS T [DK]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0171] - paragraph [0184]; figure 8 * * paragraph [0271] *; | [A]CN108696367 (SYSU CMU SHUNDE INT JOINT RES INST, et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |