EP3899463 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR HIGH PRECISION MULTI-APERTURE SPECTRAL IMAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spectral MD, Inc. 2515 McKinney Suite 1000 Dallas, TX 75201 / US | [2021/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCCALL, Brian c/o Spectral MD, Inc. 2515 McKinney Avenue Suite 1000 Dallas, Texas 75201 / US | 02 /
FAN, Wensheng c/o Spectral MD, Inc. 2515 McKinney Avenue Suite 1000 Dallas, Texas 75201 / US | 03 /
DWIGHT, Jason c/o Spectral MD, Inc. 2515 McKinney Avenue Suite 1000 Dallas, Texas 75201 / US | 04 /
GAO, Zhicun c/o Spectral MD, Inc. 2515 McKinney Avenue Suite 1000 Dallas, Texas 75201 / US | 05 /
THATCHER, Jeffrey E. c/o Spectral MD, Inc. 2515 McKinney Avenue, Suite 1000 Dallas, Texas 75201 / US | 06 /
DIMAIO, John Michael c/o Spectral MD, Inc. 2515 McKinney Avenue Suite 1000 Dallas, Texas 75201 / US | [2021/43] | Representative(s) | Zacco Denmark A/S Arne Jacobsens Allé 15 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | [2021/43] | Application number, filing date | 19895125.3 | 11.12.2019 | [2021/43] | WO2019US65818 | Priority number, date | US201862780121P | 14.12.2018 Original published format: US 201862780121 P | US201962818375P | 14.03.2019 Original published format: US 201962818375 P | [2021/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020123722 | Date: | 18.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3899463 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01J3/28, G01J3/02, G01J3/04, G01J3/36, H04N5/341, H04N9/04, H04N9/093 | [2022/51] | CPC: |
G01J3/2803 (EP,KR);
G01J3/2823 (KR);
G06T5/50 (US);
G01J3/0202 (EP,KR);
G01J3/0229 (EP,KR);
G01J3/10 (EP,KR);
G01J3/36 (EP,KR);
G06T7/0012 (US);
G06T7/33 (US);
G06T7/55 (US);
G06T7/62 (US);
H04N23/15 (EP);
H04N23/55 (US);
H04N23/56 (US);
H04N23/743 (US);
H04N25/134 (EP);
H04N25/135 (EP);
H04N25/41 (EP);
H04N5/265 (US);
G01J2003/2826 (EP,KR);
G06T2207/10036 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/43] | G01J3/28, G01J3/02, G01J3/04, G01J3/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/43] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR HOCHPRÄZISEN MULTIAPERTUR-SPEKTRALBILDGEBUNG | [2021/43] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR HIGH PRECISION MULTI-APERTURE SPECTRAL IMAGING | [2021/43] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'ANALYSE D'IMAGERIE SPECTRALE MULTI-OUVERTURE DE HAUTE PRÉCISION | [2021/43] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.2021 | Search fee paid | 08.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/43] | 08.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/43] | 13.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 15.09.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 15.09.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.09.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012242870 (KOIZUMI TATSURO [JP]); | [IA]US2018176488 (DVIR IRA [IL]); | International search | [A]US2017150903 (BARNES MICHAEL [US], et al); | [A]US9766382 (DARTY MARK ANTHONY [US]); | [A]US2018184015 (RICHARTE GERARDO GABRIEL [AR], et al); | [A]US10066997 (KÖRNER KLAUS [DE], et al) |