EP3895051 - PORTABLE HOSTED CONTENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.01.2024 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states McAfee, LLC 6220 America Center Drive San Jose, CA 95002 / US | [2021/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROY, Chris M. 519 Virginia Creeper St. Waterloo, Ontario N2V 2W3 / CA | 02 /
BISWAS, Shuborno 697 Star Flower Ave. Waterloo, Ontario N2V 2L2 / CA | [2021/42] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/42] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19895304.4 | 09.12.2019 | [2021/42] | WO2019US65194 | Priority number, date | US201816214438 | 10.12.2018 Original published format: US201816214438 | [2021/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020123364 | Date: | 18.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3895051 | Date: | 20.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 18.06.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/54, H04L9/40, H04W12/086 | [2022/31] | CPC: |
G06F9/541 (EP,US);
G06F16/972 (US);
G06F9/5077 (US);
G06F9/542 (EP);
G06F9/547 (EP,US);
H04L63/102 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/42] | G06F21/71, G06F21/50, G06F21/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/42] | Title | German: | TRAGBARER GEHOSTETER INHALT | [2021/42] | English: | PORTABLE HOSTED CONTENT | [2021/42] | French: | CONTENU HÉBERGÉ PORTATIF | [2021/42] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 21.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/42] | 27.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2002091714 (BLAUKOPF DANIEL [IL], et al) [X] 1-9,12-15 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0029]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0048] * [I] 10,11; | [A] - MOWBRAY T J ET AL, "THE ESSENTIAL CORBA: SYSTEMS INTEGRATION USING DISTRIBUTED OBJECTS", ESSENTIAL CORBA: SYSTEMS INTEGRATION USING DISTRIBUTED OBJECTS, XX, XX, (19950101), pages A, 231 - 267, XP002919719 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US2015020084 (PIERSON HAROLD [US], et al) [Y] 5-6,13-14; | [A]US9239812 (BERLIN CHRISTOPH [US]) [A] 1-20; | [AX]US2017147479 (BOYTER GERALD K [US], et al) [A] 2-4,12,18 [X] 1,7-11,15-17,19-20; | [A]US2018024872 (MEIJER HENRICUS JOHANNES MARIA [US], et al) [A] 1-20; | [A]US2018089005 (GREEN RYAN PAUL [US])[A] 1-20 | by applicant | US2002091714 |